SADA 2400 Ogden, LLC v. 2400 Ogden Avenue - 10041667 LLC
Plaintiff: SADA 2400 Ogden, LLC
Defendant: 2400 Ogden Avenue - 10041667 LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv04224
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara L Ellis
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 23:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The Court enters the following briefing schedule on Defendant's motion to dismiss #17 : Plaintiff's response is due by 9/28/2020 and Defendant's reply is due by 10/12/2020. The Court strikes the status date set for 9/9/2020 and resets it to 1/13/2021 at 9:30 a.m. for ruling on the motion to dismiss. The Court stays discovery pending ruling on Defendant's motion to dismiss. Mailed notice (rj, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Motion by Brett D Anders for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #17 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 8/28/2020 at 09:30 AM. (Anders, Brett)
August 19, 2020 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM by 2400 Ogden Avenue - 10041667 LLC in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #17 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Anders, Brett)
August 19, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant 2400 Ogden Avenue - 10041667 LLC (Anders, Brett)
August 14, 2020 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant 2400 Ogden Avenue - 10041667 LLC by Brett D Anders (Anders, Brett)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Motion by Brett D. Anders for leave to appear pro hac vice #14 is granted. Signed by the Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 8/13/2020. Mailed notice (pj, )
July 27, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17253201. (Anders, Brett)
July 23, 2020 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SADA 2400 Ogden, LLC (Vorberg, Elaine)
July 23, 2020 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff SADA 2400 Ogden, LLC by Christopher K Crimer (Crimer, Christopher)
July 23, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff SADA 2400 Ogden, LLC by Elaine S Vorberg (Vorberg, Elaine)
July 22, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The Court grants Defendant's motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #5 . Defendant's responsive pleading is due by 8/19/2020. The initial status conference in this matter is set for 9/9/2020 at 9:30AM via teleconference. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 9/2/2020. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is (866) 434-5269 and the access code is 8087837. Counsel of record will receive an email the morning of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (rj, )
July 20, 2020 Filing 9 MAILED Notice of Removal Letter to counsel of record (pj, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant 2400 Ogden Avenue - 10041667 LLC by Jean Soh (Soh, Jean)
July 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Motion by Ryan William Chapin for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #5 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 7/23/2020 at 09:30 AM. (Chapin, Ryan)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION by Defendant 2400 Ogden Avenue - 10041667 LLC for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead (Chapin, Ryan)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by 2400 Ogden Avenue - 10041667 LLC (Chapin, Ryan)
July 17, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (mp, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant 2400 Ogden Avenue - 10041667 LLC by Ryan William Chapin (Chapin, Ryan)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Chapin, Ryan)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of DuPage County, IL, case number (2020CH000433) filed by 2400 Ogden Avenue - 10041667 LLC Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17226840. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Chapin, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SADA 2400 Ogden, LLC v. 2400 Ogden Avenue - 10041667 LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2400 Ogden Avenue - 10041667 LLC
Represented By: Jean Soh
Represented By: Ryan William Chapin
Represented By: Brett D Anders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SADA 2400 Ogden, LLC
Represented By: Christopher K Crimer
Represented By: Elaine S Vorberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?