Firenze Ventures LLC v. Twin City Fire Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Firenze Ventures LLC doing business as Firenze-Italian Street Food
Defendant: Twin City Fire Insurance Company and Twin City Fire Insurance Company doing business as The Hartford
Case Number: 1:2020cv04226
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Filing 33 RESPONSE by Firenze Ventures LLCin Opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Twin City Fire Insurance Company #16 (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendices A-C)(Edelman, Daniel)
September 1, 2020 Filing 32 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Firenze Ventures LLC PLAINTIFF'S CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (Edelman, Daniel)
August 31, 2020 Filing 31 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: The court very much appreciates Attorney Lesser's declaration #30 and considers resolved the matter concerning the status report.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
August 26, 2020 Filing 30 DECLARATION of Bryan Garrett Lesser (Lesser, Bryan)
August 25, 2020 Filing 29 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion to appear pro hac vice #27 is granted. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
August 21, 2020 Filing 28 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Attorney Lesser shall file a memorandum or declaration by 8/26/2020 addressing why he represented to the court that "[d]efense counsel refused to contribute to the [draft status] report" (Dkt. 22 at 1) when, in fact, defense counsel emailed Attorney Lesser to say that he had suffered a corneal abrasion and was having trouble reading and asking if submission of the report could be delayed by a week in light of his injury (Dkt. 26-2 at 2).Mailed notice. (jlj, )
August 21, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17349830. (Gordon, Sarah)
August 20, 2020 Filing 26 DECLARATION of Anthony J. Anscombe Regarding Joint Status Report (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Anscombe, Anthony)
August 14, 2020 Filing 25 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion to proceed with conference #22 is denied. If Defendant refused to contribute to the status report, Plaintiff should have indicated as such in a timely filed unilateral status report. That said, Defendant shall file a memorandum by 8/21/2020 addressing Plaintiff's statement that it refused to contribute to the status report. Motion hearing set for 8/19/2020 #23 is stricken. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
August 14, 2020 Filing 24 STATUS Report Initial Status Report Of Defendant Twin City Fire Insurance Company by Twin City Fire Insurance Company (Anscombe, Anthony)
August 14, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Motion by Bryan G. Lesser for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief #22 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 8/19/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Lesser, Bryan)
August 14, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION by Plaintiff Firenze Ventures LLCPLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO PROCEED WITH CONFERENCE (Lesser, Bryan)
August 14, 2020 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:The parties did not file a status report by 8/10/2020, so the court assumes that they would like to postpone the 8/17/2020 initial status hearing until after the motion to dismiss #16 is fully briefed. Accordingly, the status hearing set for 8/17/2020 #9 is stricken.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
August 13, 2020 Filing 20 STATUS Report Plaintiff's Initial Status Report by Firenze Ventures LLC (Lesser, Bryan)
August 13, 2020 Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Firenze Ventures LLC by Patrick Neil Wartan (Wartan, Patrick)
August 13, 2020 Filing 18 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Firenze Ventures LLC by William Charles Wagner (Wagner, William)
August 10, 2020 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion to dismiss #16 is entered and continued. Plaintiff shall respond by 9/4/2020; Defendant shall reply by 9/18/2020. Motion hearing hearing set for 9/25/2020 at 9:30 a.m. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
August 7, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Twin City Fire Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Anthony J. Anscombe, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Anscombe, Anthony)
July 23, 2020 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Firenze Ventures LLC by Bryan G. Lesser (Lesser, Bryan)
July 23, 2020 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Firenze Ventures LLC by Dulijaza Clark (Clark, Dulijaza)
July 23, 2020 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Firenze Ventures LLC by Cathleen M. Combs (Combs, Cathleen)
July 23, 2020 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Firenze Ventures LLC by Daniel A. Edelman (Edelman, Daniel)
July 22, 2020 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for extension of time #10 is granted. The deadline for Defendant to file a responsive pleading is extended to 8/7/2020. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 21, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION by Defendant Twin City Fire Insurance Company for extension of time To Respond To Plaintiff's Complaint (Unopposed) (Anscombe, Anthony)
July 20, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Initial status hearing set for 8/17/2020 at 9:30 a.m.Initial Status Report shall be filed by 8/10/2020. Please see Judge Feinerman's web page (http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov, to "District Judges," to "Judge Gary Feinerman," to "Initial Status Hearings" under Case Management Procedures) for details on the Initial Status Hearing and Initial Status Report. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 20, 2020 Filing 7 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record (sxb, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Twin City Fire Insurance Company (Anscombe, Anthony)
July 17, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (mp, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Twin City Fire Insurance Company by Mary E Buckley (Buckley, Mary)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Twin City Fire Insurance Company by Darlene Kay Alt (Alt, Darlene)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Twin City Fire Insurance Company by Anthony J. Anscombe (Anscombe, Anthony)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Anscombe, Anthony)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2020-CH-04601) filed by Twin City Fire Insurance Company Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17226966. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Anscombe, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Firenze Ventures LLC v. Twin City Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Firenze Ventures LLC doing business as Firenze-Italian Street Food
Represented By: Dulijaza Clark
Represented By: Patrick Neil Wartan
Represented By: Cathleen M. Combs
Represented By: William Charles Wagner
Represented By: Bryan G. Lesser
Represented By: Daniel A. Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twin City Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Anthony J. Anscombe
Represented By: Darlene Kay Alt
Represented By: Mary E Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twin City Fire Insurance Company doing business as The Hartford
Represented By: Anthony J. Anscombe
Represented By: Darlene Kay Alt
Represented By: Mary E Buckley
Represented By: Sarah Danielle Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?