RAHAL v. Great Northern Insurance Co.
Plaintiff: Personal Representat IAN RAHAL
Defendant: Great Northern Insurance Co.
Case Number: 1:2020cv04229
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Martha M Pacold
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: The parties are directed to file an initial joint status report by 10/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Initial Status Report outline) (rao, )
July 31, 2020 Filing 9 Jurisdictional Statement by IAN RAHAL (Skafish, Bradley)
July 31, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff IAN RAHAL by Bradley Alan Skafish (Skafish, Bradley)
July 31, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: Plaintiff is ordered to show cause by 8/14/2020 why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The complaint alleges that defendants violated Illinois state law and does not state a basis for federal jurisdiction. (Dkt. 1.) Plaintiff may discharge this order by filing a jurisdictional statement that properly explains the basis for this court's jurisdiction. To the extent plaintiff seeks to invoke the court's diversity jurisdiction, plaintiff's jurisdictional statement must establish that the complaint meets the requirements of 28 U.S.C. 1332. With respect to citizenship of the parties, the court notes that "the legal representative of the estate of a decedent shall be deemed to be a citizen only of the same State as the decedent..." (28 U.S.C. 1332(c)(2)), and a corporation's "citizenship for diversity purposes is determined by its place of incorporation and its principal place of business," Moore v. Gen. Motors Pension Plans, 91 F.3d 848, 850 (7th Cir. 1996). Failure to comply with this order by 8/14/2020 will result in dismissal for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (rao, )
July 23, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by IAN RAHAL. Great Northern Insurance Co. waiver sent on 7/23/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (Deutschman, Jeffrey)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to James DeFranco on 7-17-20 by Plaintiff IAN RAHAL. Waiver of service due by 8/17/2020. (Deutschman, Jeffrey)
July 17, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (mp, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff IAN RAHAL by Jeffrey S. Deutschman (Deutschman, Jeffrey)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Deutschman, Jeffrey)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by IAN RAHAL; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17227342. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Insurance Policy)(Deutschman, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RAHAL v. Great Northern Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Northern Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Personal Representat IAN RAHAL
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Deutschman
Represented By: Bradley Alan Skafish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?