Jones v. Lake et al
Plaintiff: Korey Jones
Defendant: Gunder, Phillips, Lake, Garant and Anderson
Case Number: 1:2020cv04231
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 MAILED a copy of order #7 to Plaintiff and the Court's fiscal department. (lma, )
August 27, 2020 Filing 8 ENTERED JUDGMENT. Mailed notice (lma, )
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: By order dated July 29, 2020 #6 , the Court denied Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis, directed him to pay the full $400 filing fee, and warned him that failure to comply by August 12, 2020, would result in summary dismissal of this case. Although the Court waited an additional two weeks to account for possible mail delays, Plaintiff has not responded or otherwise communicated with the Court. Accordingly, this case is dismissed without prejudice based on Plaintiff's failure to comply with the July 29, 2020 order, see Fed. R. App. P. 41(b), and all pending motions are denied as moot. Having brought this action, Plaintiff remains obligated to pay the full filing fee. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1). The Court directs the Clerk to: (1) enter a final judgment of dismissal; and (2) send a copy of this order to Plaintiff and the Court's fiscal department. This case is closed. Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 8/27/2020. Mailed notice (lma, )
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is denied. If Plaintiff wants to proceed with this action, he must prepay the full $400 statutory filing fee. If Plaintiff does not comply by August 12, 2020, this case will be summarily dismissed without prejudice. Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 7/29/2020. Mailed notice. (sxb, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Korey Jones for appointment of counsel. (jh, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Korey Jones for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (Exhibits) (jh, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet. (jh, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint by Korey Jones. (jh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Lake et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gunder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Korey Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?