Sellers v. Shorewood Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Courtney Jermaine Sellers
Defendant: John Doe and Shorewood Police Department
Case Number: 1:2020cv04232
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Martha M Pacold
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Courtney Jermaine Sellers for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and affidavit. (Envelope postmark date 9/1/20). (gcy, )
August 21, 2020 MAILED copy of Order dated 8/21/20 w/I.F.P. Application to Courtney Jermaine Sellers. (gcy, )
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Plaintiff's request for an extension of time to comply with the court's July 21, 2020 order #5 is granted. By September 11, 2020, Plaintiff must either submit a completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the full statutory filing fee of $400. If he does not comply, the court will summarily dismiss this case. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis, along with a copy of this order. Signed by the Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 8/21/2020. Mailed notice(gcy, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiff Courtney Jermaine Sellers for extension of time (Exhibit) (envelope postmarked 8/14/2020) (bg, )
July 21, 2020 MAILED copy of Order dated 7/21/20 w/ In Form Pauperis Form to Courtney Jermaine Sellers. (gcy, )
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Plaintiff has submitted a complaint #1 but did not prepay the filing fee or file an application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. By August 21, 2020, Plaintiff must either: (1) submit a completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis that includes a certified copy of the trust fund account statement (or institutional equivalent) for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint and a completed certification from the appropriate official of each institution where Plaintiff is or was confined during the last six months; or (2) pay the full statutory filing fee of $400. If he does not comply, the court will summarily dismiss this case. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis, along with a copy of this order. Signed by the Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 7/21/2020. Mailed notice(gcy, ) Modified on 7/27/2020 (sxb, ).
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (pj, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by Courtney Jermaine Sellers (Attachments: #1 Envelope postmark is illegible)(pj, )
July 10, 2020 Filing 3 Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020. Mailed notice. (pj, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sellers v. Shorewood Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shorewood Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Jermaine Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?