Wesson Jr. v. City of Waukegan Illinois et al
Plaintiff: Carnell D. Wesson Jr.
Defendant: City of Waukegan Illinois, Lake County Medical Staff, Lake County Jail and Officer Erving
Case Number: 1:2020cv04234
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Filing 8 ENTERED JUDGMENT. Mailed notice. (pj, )
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: By order dated July 24, 2020, the Court denied Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and ordered Plaintiff to pay the $400 filing fee and show cause why this case should not be dismissed because Plaintiff had made false statements in his in forma pauperis application #6 . The Court warned Plaintiff that failure to comply with the Court's order by August 14, 2020, would result in summary dismissal of this case. Plaintiff did not respond to the Court's order, and the August 14, 2020 deadline has passed. Accordingly, this case is dismissed without prejudice for Plaintiff's failure to comply with the Court's order of July 24, 2020. The Court directs the Clerk of Court to terminate all pending motions #4 as moot. Case closed. Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 8/26/2020. Mailed notice (pj, )
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is denied for lack of a sufficient showing of indigence. By August 14, 2020, Plaintiff must: (1) pay the full statutory filing fee of $400.00; and (2) show cause why this case should not be dismissed based on a false allegation of poverty. If he fails to comply with both of these directives, the Court will summarily dismiss this case. Additionally, Plaintiff is advised that he has a continuing obligation to keep the Court apprised of his current address, and failure to do so will result in dismissal of this action for failure to comply with a court order and for want of prosecution. Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 7/24/2020. Mailed notice(gcy, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Carnell D. Wesson Jr. for attorney representation (pj, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Carnell D. Wesson Jr. for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (Exhibit) (pj, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (pj, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by Carnell D. Wesson Jr. (Exhibits) (Attachments: #1 Envelope not postmarked)(pj, )
July 10, 2020 Filing 5 Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020. Mailed notice. (pj, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wesson Jr. v. City of Waukegan Illinois et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Waukegan Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake County Medical Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Erving
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carnell D. Wesson Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?