D2 Dental of Lansing, P.C. et al v. Citibank, N.A.
Plaintiff: D2 Dental of Oak Street, P.C., D2 Dental of Lansing, P.C. and D2 Dental of Illinois, P.C.
Defendant: Citibank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2020cv04240
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Motion by Debra Devassy Babu for presentment of motion to dismiss #14 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 9/17/2020 at 09:45 AM. (Babu, Debra)
September 11, 2020 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM by Citibank, N.A. in support of motion to dismiss #14 (Babu, Debra)
September 11, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION by Defendant Citibank, N.A. to dismiss (Babu, Debra)
August 4, 2020 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Plaintiffs' motion to seal Reference List to Complaint #6 is granted. Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time #10 is granted. Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended and due by 9/11/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 10/9/2020 at 9:45 a.m. (to track the case only; no appearance will be required). Joint Rule 26(f) planning report due 10/2/2020. The court will enter a schedule based on the report. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
August 3, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion by Debra Devassy Babu for presentment of extension of time #10 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 8/7/2020 at 09:45 AM. (Babu, Debra)
August 3, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by Peter J. Donoghue for presentment of motion to seal document #6 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 8/6/2020 at 09:45 AM. (Donoghue, Peter)
August 3, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION by Defendant Citibank, N.A. for extension of time (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Babu, Debra)
August 3, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Citibank, N.A. by David Alexander Darcy (Darcy, David)
July 31, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Citibank, N.A. by Debra Devassy Babu (Babu, Debra)
July 20, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Citibank, N.A. (ecw, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiffs D2 Dental of Illinois, P.C., D2 Dental of Lansing, P.C., D2 Dental of Oak Street, P.C. to seal document sealed document #5 Rule 5.2 Reference List to Complaint (Donoghue, Peter)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs D2 Dental of Illinois, P.C., D2 Dental of Lansing, P.C., D2 Dental of Oak Street, P.C. Rule 5.2 Reference List to Complaint (Donoghue, Peter)
July 17, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (mp, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by All Plaintiffs (Donoghue, Peter)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs D2 Dental of Illinois, P.C., D2 Dental of Lansing, P.C., D2 Dental of Oak Street, P.C. by Peter J. Donoghue (Donoghue, Peter)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Donoghue, Peter)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by D2 Dental of Lansing, P.C., D2 Dental of Oak Street, P.C., D2 Dental of Illinois, P.C.; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17228763. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Donoghue, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D2 Dental of Lansing, P.C. et al v. Citibank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D2 Dental of Oak Street, P.C.
Represented By: Peter J. Donoghue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D2 Dental of Lansing, P.C.
Represented By: Peter J. Donoghue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D2 Dental of Illinois, P.C.
Represented By: Peter J. Donoghue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank, N.A.
Represented By: David Alexander Darcy
Represented By: Debra Devassy Babu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?