Blue v. LTD Acquisitions, LLC
Plaintiff: Leixy Blue
Defendant: LTD Acquisitions, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv04246
Filed: July 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Plaintiff shall expeditiously send a copy of order Dkt. 9 to Defendant.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
September 9, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:The status hearing set for 9/17/2020 #4 is stricken. The motion hearing set for 9/21/2020 #7 is stricken and re-set for 9/22/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
September 7, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion by Richard John Meier for presentment of motion for entry of default #7 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 9/21/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Meier, Richard)
September 7, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiff Leixy Blue for entry of default Against Defendant (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Meier, Richard)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leixy Blue as to LTD Acquisitions, LLC on 8/5/2020, answer due 8/26/2020. (Meier, Richard)
July 20, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant LTD Acquisitions, LLC (ecw, )
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Initial status hearing set for 9/17/2020 at 9:15 a.m. Initial Status Report shall be filed by 9/10/2020. Please see Judge Feinerman's web page (http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov, to "District Judges," to "Judge Gary Feinerman," to "Initial Status Hearings" under Case Management Procedures) for details on the Initial Status Hearing and Initial Status Report. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
July 20, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cp, )
July 18, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Leixy Blue by Richard John Meier (Meier, Richard)
July 18, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Meier, Richard)
July 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Leixy Blue; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17229560.(Meier, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blue v. LTD Acquisitions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LTD Acquisitions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leixy Blue
Represented By: Richard John Meier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?