Harris v. Turner
Plaintiff: Torey Harris
Defendant: Betty Turner
Case Number: 1:2020cv04278
Filed: July 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis #4 . In order for the Court to determine whether Plaintiff qualifies to proceed without paying the filing fee, Plaintiff must fill out the Northern District of Illinois In Forma Pauperis Application and Financial Affidavit (Non-Prisoner Case) (the "Application") completely and accurately. Plaintiff's application is incomplete; there are no responses to questions 4, 7, and 8, and the response to question 1 does not include any date of last employment or last monthly take-home pay. The Court requests that the Clerk mail a copy of the Application to Plaintiff. The Application is also available on the "Online Forms" page of the Court's website, at https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/OnlineForms.aspx#. The direct link to the pdf of the Application is: https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets /_documents/_forms/_online/IFP_nonPrisoner.pdf. Plaintiff has until September 14, 2020, to file the Application or pay the $400 filing fee; payment may be made by check or money order payable to Clerk, United States District Court. Failure to submit the Application or pay the filing fee by September 14, 2020, may result in summary dismissal of this case. Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 8/12/2020: Mailed notice (rc, )
July 21, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiff Torey Harris for attorney representation (bg, )
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Torey Harris for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (bg, )
July 21, 2020 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Torey Harris (bg, )
July 21, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (bg, )
July 21, 2020 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and 0 copies by Torey Harris (Exhibit) (bg, )
July 10, 2020 Filing 8 Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020. Mailed notice. (bg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Torey Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?