International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Petitioner: International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division
Case Number: 1:2020cv04318
Filed: July 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John J Tharp
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2020 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: The parties are directed to review the procedures for initial status reports, located at [https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?79eF+7uiX7ewBj/ITKrjoA==] and to submit an initial status report by 9/28/20. The report should include a proposed case management schedule reflecting any disputes between the parties as to the proposed schedule.Mailed notice (air, )
August 5, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division. Union Pacific Railroad Company waiver sent on 7/23/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (Mckinley, Shawn)
July 27, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Petitioner International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division by Shawn Mckinley (Mckinley, Shawn)
July 27, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Petitioner International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division by Kevin C. Brodar (Brodar, Kevin)
July 23, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cp, )
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17244094. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons in a Civil Case)(Mckinley, Shawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers - Transportation Division
Represented By: Shawn Mckinley
Represented By: Kevin C. Brodar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?