Paus v. Red Dot Storage 4, LLC
Plaintiff: William Paus
Defendant: Red Dot Storage 4, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv04328
Filed: July 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Steven C Seeger
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION by Attorney Lawrence M. Benjamin to withdraw as attorney for Red Dot Storage 4, LLC. New address information: Sparkplug Capital, LLC, P.O. Box 600, Boulder, Colorado, 80306 (Benjamin, Lawrence)
September 11, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File a responsive Pleading (Dckt. No. #8 ) is granted. The Court extends the deadline for the defendant to answer or otherwise plead to plaintiff's complaint to September 30, 2020. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
September 11, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION by Defendant Red Dot Storage 4, LLC for extension of time To File Responsive Pleading (Unopposed) (Benjamin, Lawrence)
August 3, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST for Clerk of Court to refund filing fee in the amount of 400.00, receipt no. 0752- 17245388, (Benjamin, Lawrence)
July 24, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File a Responsive Pleading (Dckt. No. #5 ) is hereby granted. Defendant shall file an answer or otherwise plead to plaintiff's complaint by September 14, 2020. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION by Defendant Red Dot Storage 4, LLC for extension of time To File Responsive Pleading (Unopposed) (Benjamin, Lawrence)
July 23, 2020 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: An initial status report is due by October 9, 2020. Counsel must read the Standing Order entitled "Initial Status Conferences and Joint Initial Status Reports" on the Court's website. The parties must discuss settlement in good faith and make a serious attempt to resolve this case amicably. The parties also must confer as required by Rule 26(f) about the nature, scope, and duration of discovery. The parties must submit two documents to the Court. First, the parties must file the Joint Initial Status Report under Rule 26(f) on the docket. A Word version of the Joint Initial Status Report is available on the Court's website. Second, the parties must submit a Word version of a proposed Scheduling Order under Rule 16(b) to the Court's proposed order inbox. Lead counsel for the parties must participate in filing the initial status report. Plaintiff must serve this Order on all other parties. If the defendant has not been served with process, plaintiff's counsel must contact the Courtroom Deputy at jessica_j_ramos@ilnd.uscourts.gov to reschedule the initial status report deadline. Plaintiff should not file the Joint Initial Status Report before the defendant(s) has been served with process. All counsel of record must read and comply with this Court's Standing Orders on its webpage. Please pay special attention to the Standing Orders about Depositions and Discovery. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
July 23, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Steven C. Seeger. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cp, )
July 23, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Red Dot Storage 4, LLC by Lawrence Mitchell Benjamin (Benjamin, Lawrence)
July 23, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Benjamin, Lawrence)
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Kendall County Circuit Court, case number (2020L000046) filed by Red Dot Storage 4, LLC Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17245437. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Complaint from State Court)(Benjamin, Lawrence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paus v. Red Dot Storage 4, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Dot Storage 4, LLC
Represented By: Lawrence Mitchell Benjamin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Paus
Represented By: Daniel Walker, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?