Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Pension Fund et al v. Paul Buschauer
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Joint Cooperation Trust Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Scholarship Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Deferred Savings Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Apprenticeship Fund and Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Pension Fund
Defendant: Paul Buschauer and d/b/a Landmark Restoration and Paul Buschauer Individually doing business as Landmark Restoration
Case Number: 1:2020cv04351
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles P Kocoras
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Telephonic status hearing set for 10/15/2020 at 10:40 AM. For the telephonic status hearing, parties are to use the following call-in number: (888) 684 8852, conference code 8819984. Counsel of record will receive an email the morning of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. The public and media representatives may have access to the hearing via the same number. Audio recording of the hearing is not permitted; violations of this prohibition may result in sanctions. Participants are directed to keep their device muted when they are not speaking. Thank you for your cooperation. Mailed notice (vcf, )
August 10, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Joint Cooperation Trust Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Pension Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Apprenticeship Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Deferred Savings Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Scholarship Fund as to Paul Buschauer on 7/29/2020, answer due 8/19/2020. (Anderson, James)
July 24, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Paul Buschauer and d/b/a Landmark Restoration (gw, )
July 24, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (gw, )
July 24, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Apprenticeship Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Deferred Savings Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Joint Cooperation Trust Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Pension Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Scholarship Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Welfare Fund by Grant R. Piechocinski (Piechocinski, Grant)
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Apprenticeship Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Deferred Savings Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Joint Cooperation Trust Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Pension Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Scholarship Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Welfare Fund by Brian Christopher James (James, Brian)
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Apprenticeship Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Deferred Savings Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Joint Cooperation Trust Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Pension Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Scholarship Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Welfare Fund by Donald D. Schwartz (Schwartz, Donald)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Apprenticeship Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Deferred Savings Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Joint Cooperation Trust Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Pension Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Scholarship Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Welfare Fund by James R. Anderson (Anderson, James)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Anderson, James)
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Joint Cooperation Trust Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Pension Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Apprenticeship Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Deferred Savings Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Welfare Fund, Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Scholarship Fund; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17248163. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Labor Agreement)(Anderson, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Pension Fund et al v. Paul Buschauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Welfare Fund
Represented By: Grant R. Piechocinski
Represented By: Donald D. Schwartz
Represented By: Brian Christopher James
Represented By: James R. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Joint Cooperation Trust Fund
Represented By: Grant R. Piechocinski
Represented By: Donald D. Schwartz
Represented By: Brian Christopher James
Represented By: James R. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Scholarship Fund
Represented By: Grant R. Piechocinski
Represented By: Donald D. Schwartz
Represented By: Brian Christopher James
Represented By: James R. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Deferred Savings Fund
Represented By: Grant R. Piechocinski
Represented By: Donald D. Schwartz
Represented By: Brian Christopher James
Represented By: James R. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Apprenticeship Fund
Represented By: Grant R. Piechocinski
Represented By: Donald D. Schwartz
Represented By: Brian Christopher James
Represented By: James R. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Chicago Painters and Decorators Pension Fund
Represented By: Grant R. Piechocinski
Represented By: Donald D. Schwartz
Represented By: Brian Christopher James
Represented By: James R. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Buschauer and d/b/a Landmark Restoration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Buschauer Individually doing business as Landmark Restoration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?