Longobardi v. Honeywell International Inc., f/k/a AlliedSignal Inc., as successor-in-interest to The Bendix Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Pamela Longobardi
Defendant: Kelsey-Hayes Company, Mack Trucks, Inc., Honeywell International Inc., f/k/a AlliedSignal Inc., as successor-in-interest to The Bendix Corporation, Carlisle Industrial Brake & Friction, Inc., f/k/a Motion Control Industries, Inc. as successor-in-interest to Carlisle Corporation, Paccar, Inc., a/k/a Kenworth Truck Company a/k/a Peterbilt Motors Company, General Electric Company, CBS Corporation, f/k/a Viacom, Inc., merger to CBS Corporation, f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corp., John Crane, Inc., Cummins, Inc., Eaton Corporation f/k/a Cutler-Hammer, Navistar, Inc., f/k/a International Truck and Engine Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Borg-Warner Corporation, Pneumo Abex Corporation, DCO, LLC, Motion Control Industries, Inc., as successor-in-interest to Carlisle Corporation, Federal Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust, CBS Corporation, Navistar, Inc, Carlisle Industrial Brake & Friction, Inc., Eaton Corporation, Paccar, Inc., Honeywell International Inc., Cutler-Hammer, Peterbilt Motors Company, Kenworth Truck Company, Motion Control Industries, Inc., AlliedSignal Inc, International Truck and Engine Corporation and Viacom, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv04367
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Filing 27 STATUS Report Joint Initial Status Report by Pamela Longobardi (Wilke, Tyler)
September 16, 2020 Filing 26 REPLY by Plaintiff Pamela Longobardi to motion to remand #21 in Support of Her Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I)(Wilke, Tyler)
September 3, 2020 Filing 25 RESPONSE by Defendant Honeywell International Inc. to motion to remand #21 , memorandum in support of motion #22 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Harvey, Shannon)
August 17, 2020 Filing 24 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Pamela Longobardi by Jennifer Hendrix Gelman (Gelman, Jennifer)
August 17, 2020 Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion to remand #21 is entered and continued. Defendants shall respond to the motion by 9/3/2020; Plaintiff shall reply by 9/16/2020. Initial status hearing set for 9/16/2020 #18 is stricken and re-set for 9/25/2020 at 9:15 a.m. The parties shall file an initial joint status report by 9/18/2020. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
August 14, 2020 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM by Pamela Longobardi in support of motion to remand #21 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E)(Wilke, Tyler)
August 14, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION by Plaintiff Pamela Longobardi to remand Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447 (Wilke, Tyler)
August 11, 2020 Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant DCO, LLC by Anthony David Danhelka (Danhelka, Anthony)
August 11, 2020 Filing 19 Defendant Honeywell International, Inc.'s Answer to Third Amended Complaint ANSWER to Complaint by Honeywell International Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service COS)(Harvey, Shannon)
August 10, 2020 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for leave to file #14 is granted. Defendant Honeywell shall file its answer as a separate docket entry. Initial status hearing set for 9/16/2020 at 9:00 a.m. The parties shall file an initial joint status report by 9/9/2020. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
August 10, 2020 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for leave to file #16 is denied as moot.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
August 7, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION by Defendant Honeywell International Inc. for leave to file Re-filed Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Answer to Third Amended Complaint, Instanter (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Harvey, Shannon) Modified on 8/7/2020 (pj, ).
August 6, 2020 Filing 15 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Gary Feinerman for all further proceedings. Honorable Martha M. Pacold no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/6/2020.(rp, )
August 5, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION by Defendant Honeywell International Inc. for leave to file Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Answer to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint, Instanter (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Harvey, Shannon)
August 5, 2020 Filing 13 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Harvey, Shannon)
July 29, 2020 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant John Crane, Inc. by Pamela Rose Gamble (Gamble, Pamela)
July 29, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant John Crane, Inc. by Mark I. Tivin (Tivin, Mark)
July 27, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Pamela Longobardi by Tyler Wilke (Wilke, Tyler)
July 27, 2020 Filing 8 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (ec, )
July 27, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Honeywell International Inc., f/k/a AlliedSignal Inc., as successor-in-interest to The Bendix Corporation by Jennifer Lynn Smith (Smith, Jennifer)
July 27, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Honeywell International Inc., f/k/a AlliedSignal Inc., as successor-in-interest to The Bendix Corporation by Jennifer Jerit Johnson (Johnson, Jennifer)
July 27, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Honeywell International Inc., f/k/a AlliedSignal Inc., as successor-in-interest to The Bendix Corporation by Matthew J O'Malley (O'Malley, Matthew)
July 27, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (exr, )
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Honeywell International Inc., f/k/a AlliedSignal Inc., as successor-in-interest to The Bendix Corporation (Harvey, Shannon)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Honeywell International Inc., f/k/a AlliedSignal Inc., as successor-in-interest to The Bendix Corporation by Shannon M. Harvey (Harvey, Shannon)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Harvey, Shannon)
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2019 L 002580) filed by Honeywell International Inc., f/k/a AlliedSignal Inc., as successor-in-interest to The Bendix Corporation Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17251219. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Harvey, Shannon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Longobardi v. Honeywell International Inc., f/k/a AlliedSignal Inc., as successor-in-interest to The Bendix Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelsey-Hayes Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mack Trucks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc., f/k/a AlliedSignal Inc., as successor-in-interest to The Bendix Corporation
Represented By: Shannon M. Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlisle Industrial Brake & Friction, Inc., f/k/a Motion Control Industries, Inc. as successor-in-interest to Carlisle Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paccar, Inc., a/k/a Kenworth Truck Company a/k/a Peterbilt Motors Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation, f/k/a Viacom, Inc., merger to CBS Corporation, f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane, Inc.
Represented By: Mark I. Tivin
Represented By: Pamela Rose Gamble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cummins, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Corporation f/k/a Cutler-Hammer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navistar, Inc., f/k/a International Truck and Engine Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borg-Warner Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DCO, LLC
Represented By: Anthony David Danhelka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motion Control Industries, Inc., as successor-in-interest to Carlisle Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Mogul Asbestos Personal Injury Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navistar, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlisle Industrial Brake & Friction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paccar, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J O'Malley
Represented By: Jennifer Jerit Johnson
Represented By: Shannon M. Harvey
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cutler-Hammer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peterbilt Motors Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenworth Truck Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motion Control Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AlliedSignal Inc
Represented By: Matthew J O'Malley
Represented By: Jennifer Jerit Johnson
Represented By: Shannon M. Harvey
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Truck and Engine Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Longobardi
Represented By: Tyler Wilke
Represented By: Jennifer Hendrix Gelman
Represented By: Ethan Flint
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?