Laufer et al
Plaintiff: Ms Deborah Laufer
Defendant: Shah Hospitality, L.L.C.
Case Number: 1:2020cv04378
Filed: July 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles R Norgle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle:Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (ewf, )
September 23, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Deborah Laufer (Knox, Amale)
September 4, 2020 Filing 5 SETTLEMENT Agreement (Knox, Amale)
August 12, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Deborah Laufer by Robert Edward Lewin. (nsf, )
August 12, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Knox, Amale)
July 28, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Shah Hospitality, L.L.C. (dxb, )
July 27, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (daj, )
July 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Deborah Laufer; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17252989.(Knox, Amale)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laufer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms Deborah Laufer
Represented By: Amale Knox
Represented By: Robert Edward Lewin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shah Hospitality, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?