SEIU Local No. 1 Health Fund v. Service Corporation International
Plaintiff: SEIU Local No. 1 Health Fund
Defendant: Service Corporation International
Case Number: 1:2020cv04389
Filed: July 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Parties' joint motion to stay answer deadline #11 is granted. Defendant's answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to 11/2/2020. Scheduling Conference is reset for 11/30/2020 at 9:45 a.m. (to track the case only; no appearance will be required). Joint Rule 26(f) planning report due 11/23/2020. The court will enter a schedule based on the report. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
September 1, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion by Samuel Michael Schwartz-Fenwick for presentment of motion to stay #11 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 9/4/2020 at 09:45 AM. (Schwartz-Fenwick, Samuel)
September 1, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION by Defendant Service Corporation International to stay (Joint Motion to Stay Answer Deadline) (Schwartz-Fenwick, Samuel)
September 1, 2020 Filing 10 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Service Corporation International (Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement) (Schwartz-Fenwick, Samuel)
September 1, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Service Corporation International by Samuel Michael Schwartz-Fenwick (Schwartz-Fenwick, Samuel)
September 1, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Service Corporation International by Jules A. Levenson (Levenson, Jules)
August 12, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff SEIU Local No. 1 Health Fund regarding Summons and Complaint served on SERVICE CORPORATION INTERNATIONAL on 08/12/2020 (Hensel, Sam) (Docket Text Modified by Clerks Office on 8/13/2020) (ec, ).
August 6, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Scheduling Conference set for 11/10/2020 at 09:45 AM (to track the case only; no appearance will be required). Joint Rule 26(f) planning report due 11/5/2020. The court will enter a schedule based on the report. Mailed notice (reg)
July 28, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Service Corporation International (dxb, )
July 27, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (daj, )
July 27, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff SEIU Local No. 1 Health Fund by Robert B. Greenberg (Greenberg, Robert)
July 27, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff SEIU Local No. 1 Health Fund by Sam Hensel (Hensel, Sam)
July 27, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hensel, Sam)
July 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by SEIU Local No. 1 Health Fund; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17255351.(Hensel, Sam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SEIU Local No. 1 Health Fund v. Service Corporation International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEIU Local No. 1 Health Fund
Represented By: Robert B. Greenberg
Represented By: Sam Hensel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Service Corporation International
Represented By: Samuel Michael Schwartz-Fenwick
Represented By: Jules A. Levenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?