Del Pilar v. Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation et al
Plaintiff: David Del Pilar
Defendant: Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Transunion LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv04392
Filed: July 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Martha M Pacold
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Filing 27 ANSWER to Complaint by Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation(Sullivan, Christian)
September 22, 2020 Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(Grode, Taylor)
September 21, 2020 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative and Other Defenses by Equifax Information Services, LLC(Stein, Brandon)
September 2, 2020 Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold:Defendant, Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation's ("NMAC") unopposed motion for extension of time to answer #22 is granted. Defendant NMAC to answer or otherwise plead to plaintiff's complaint by 9/23/2020. (rao, )
August 31, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Motion by Christian Allen Sullivan for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #22 before Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 9/3/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Sullivan, Christian)
August 31, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION by Defendant Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation for extension of time to file answer (Sullivan, Christian)
August 28, 2020 Filing 21 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Transunion LLC (Brady, Scott)
August 28, 2020 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint And Affirmative Defenses by Transunion LLC(Brady, Scott)
August 27, 2020 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold:Consent motion for extension of time for Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint #18 is granted. Defendant Equifax to answer or otherwise plead to plaintiff's complaint by 9/21/2020. (rao, )
August 27, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 Consent Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Stein, Brandon)
August 27, 2020 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC by Brandon S. Stein (Stein, Brandon)
August 26, 2020 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold:Defendant Experian Information Solution, Inc.'s unopposed motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #15 is granted. Defendant Experian to answer or otherwise plead to plaintiff's complaint by 9/22/2020. The parties are directed to file an initial joint status report by 10/5/2020. (rao, )
August 25, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. for extension of time to file answer (UNOPPOSED) (Grode, Taylor)
August 25, 2020 Filing 14 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Grode, Taylor)
August 25, 2020 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. by Taylor M Grode (Grode, Taylor)
August 13, 2020 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Transunion LLC by Daniel Owen Halvorsen (Halvorsen, Daniel)
August 13, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Transunion LLC by Scott Edwin Brady (Brady, Scott)
August 12, 2020 Filing 10 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation (Sullivan, Christian)
August 12, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation by Ross William Bartolotta (Bartolotta, Ross)
August 12, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation by Christian Allen Sullivan (Sullivan, Christian)
August 12, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Del Pilar as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. on 8/11/2020, answer due 9/1/2020. (Hijazin, Majdi)
August 11, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Del Pilar as to Transunion LLC on 8/10/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. (Hijazin, Majdi)
August 11, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Del Pilar as to Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation on 8/10/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. (Hijazin, Majdi)
August 11, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Del Pilar as to Equifax Information Services, LLC on 8/10/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. (Hijazin, Majdi)
July 29, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation, Transunion LLC. (ng, )
July 28, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (exr, )
July 27, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff David Del Pilar by Majdi Y. Hijazin (Hijazin, Majdi)
July 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by David Del Pilar; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17256456. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hijazin, Majdi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Del Pilar v. Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation
Represented By: Christian Allen Sullivan
Represented By: Ross William Bartolotta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Brandon S. Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Taylor M Grode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transunion LLC
Represented By: Daniel Owen Halvorsen
Represented By: Scott Edwin Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Del Pilar
Represented By: Majdi Y. Hijazin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?