Wragge et al v. The Boeing Company
Plaintiff: Karen Wragge and David Beard
Defendant: The Boeing Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv04457
Filed: July 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE by The Boeing Companyin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Karen Wragge to remand #16 (Webb, Dan)
August 19, 2020 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: The Court sets the following briefing schedule on Plaintiffs' motion to remand #16 as follows: Defendant to respond by 9/10/2020. Plaintiffs to reply by 9/24/2020. Motion to appear pro hac vice #18 is granted; Ruling before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 10/15/2020 at 9:45 a.m. (to track the case only, no appearance is required). The Court will issue a ruling by mail. Application to appear pro hac vice of Joseph Wheeler #18 as counsel for plaintiffs is granted. No appearance required on 8/20/2020. Mailed notice. (mgh, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17339922. (Wheeler, Joseph)
August 17, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Motion by Patrick M Jones for presentment of motion to remand #16 before Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo on 8/20/2020 at 09:45 AM. (Jones, Patrick)
August 17, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION by Plaintiff Karen Wragge to remand (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Jones, Patrick)
August 11, 2020 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Scheduling Conference set for 10/14/2020 at 09:45 AM (for tracking purposes only; no appearance will be required). Joint Rule 26(f) planning report due 10/9/2020. The court will enter a schedule based on the report. Mailed notice (reg)
August 11, 2020 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Boeing Company by Sandra Edwards (Edwards, Sandra)
August 11, 2020 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Boeing Company by Joseph Laurence Motto (Motto, Joseph)
August 11, 2020 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Boeing Company by Christopher B Essig (Essig, Christopher)
August 11, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by The Boeing Company(Webb, Dan)
August 11, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Boeing Company by Dan K. Webb (Webb, Dan)
August 7, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Boeing Company by Vernon L. Woolston (Woolston, Vernon)
July 31, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Boeing Company by Todd W. Rosencrans (Rosencrans, Todd)
July 31, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs David Beard, Karen Wragge by Patrick M Jones (Jones, Patrick)
July 29, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (daj, )
July 29, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Boeing Company by Bates McIntyre Larson (Larson, Bates)
July 29, 2020 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by The Boeing Company (Stetsko, Kathleen)
July 29, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Stetsko, Kathleen)
July 29, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Boeing Company by Kathleen A. Stetsko (Stetsko, Kathleen)
July 29, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2020 L 007821) filed by The Boeing Company Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17264202. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Stetsko, Kathleen)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020. Mailed notice. (rc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wragge et al v. The Boeing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Wragge
Represented By: Joseph Charles Wheeler
Represented By: Patrick M Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Beard
Represented By: Joseph Charles Wheeler
Represented By: Patrick M Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Boeing Company
Represented By: Kathleen A. Stetsko
Represented By: Bates McIntyre Larson
Represented By: Joseph Laurence Motto
Represented By: Sandra Edwards
Represented By: Vernon L. Woolston
Represented By: Dan K. Webb
Represented By: Christopher B Essig
Represented By: Todd W. Rosencrans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?