Zepeda v. OneBeacon Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Arkasha Zepeda
Defendant: Del Express, Inc., as an interested and necessary party, Atlantic Specialty Insurance Co., Inc., Igor Zunac, OneBeacon Services, LLC and Del Express, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv04458
Filed: July 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Manish S Shah
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Co., Inc., OneBeacon Services, LLCin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Arkasha Zepeda to remand #14 (Devitt, Donald)
September 15, 2020 Filing 17 REPLY by Defendants Atlantic Specialty Insurance Co., Inc., OneBeacon Services, LLC to response to motion #16 (Devitt, Donald)
September 1, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE by Arkasha Zepeda to MOTION by Defendants Atlantic Specialty Insurance Co., Inc., OneBeacon Services, LLC to dismiss Complaint and Compel Arbitration #11 (Acosta, George)
August 27, 2020 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The briefing schedule on plaintiff's motion to remand is as follows: defendants' response is due 9/17/20; plaintiff's reply 10/1/20. The briefing schedule on the motion to dismiss remains as set. If the court denies the motion to remand, it will likely resolve the motion to dismiss in the same order. Rulings on the pending motions will be by cm/ecf. Notices mailed. (psm, )
August 26, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION by Plaintiff Arkasha Zepeda to remand (Acosta, George)
August 11, 2020 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #9 is granted. Plaintiff's response to the motion to dismiss #11 is due 9/1/20; defendants' reply is due 9/15/20. The court will issue a ruling by cm/ecf. Discovery is stayed. Notices mailed. (psm, )
August 5, 2020 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Co., Inc., OneBeacon Services, LLC in support of motion to dismiss #11 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint with Exhibits A-E)(Devitt, Donald)
August 5, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION by Defendants Atlantic Specialty Insurance Co., Inc., OneBeacon Services, LLC to dismiss Complaint and Compel Arbitration (Devitt, Donald)
August 5, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Arkasha Zepeda by George L. Acosta (Acosta, George)
August 3, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17275876. (Steck, Janis)
July 30, 2020 Filing 7 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (bg, )
July 29, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Atlantic Specialty Insurance Co., Inc., OneBeacon Services, LLC by Caroline D. Pratt (Pratt, Caroline)
July 29, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Co., Inc. (Devitt, Donald)
July 29, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure by OneBeacon Services, LLC (Devitt, Donald)
July 29, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Atlantic Specialty Insurance Co., Inc., OneBeacon Services, LLC by Donald W. Devitt (Devitt, Donald)
July 29, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Devitt, Donald)
July 29, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Arkasha Zepeda v. DelExpress, Inc. et al, case number (20-CH-000232) filed by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Co., Inc., OneBeacon Services, LLC Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17264284. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal)(Devitt, Donald)
July 29, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (daj, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zepeda v. OneBeacon Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arkasha Zepeda
Represented By: George L. Acosta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Del Express, Inc., as an interested and necessary party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Specialty Insurance Co., Inc.
Represented By: Caroline D. Pratt
Represented By: Donald W. Devitt
Represented By: Janis E. Steck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Igor Zunac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OneBeacon Services, LLC
Represented By: Caroline D. Pratt
Represented By: Donald W. Devitt
Represented By: Janis E. Steck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Del Express, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?