Royalty Banquet Hall, Inc. v. Society Insurance
Plaintiff: Royalty Banquet Hall, Inc.
Defendant: Society Insurance
Case Number: 1:2020cv04477
Filed: July 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time #12 is granted. Defendant has until and including 9/30/2020 to file its answer or other responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint. Initial status hearing set for 9/17/20 is reset to 10/15/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Joint status report is now due 10/9/2020. Mailed notice (cdh, )
September 4, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE by Society Insurance (Underwood, Thomas)
September 4, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION by Defendant Society Insurance for extension of time (Underwood, Thomas)
September 4, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Society Insurance by Michelle Anne Miner (Miner, Michelle)
September 4, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Society Insurance by Amy Elizabeth Chesshir Frantz (Chesshir Frantz, Amy)
September 4, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Society Insurance by Michael Duane Sanders (Sanders, Michael)
September 4, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Society Insurance by Thomas B. Underwood (Underwood, Thomas)
August 11, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Royalty Banquet Hall, Inc. as to Society Insurance on 8/10/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. (Kosla, Taylor)
August 4, 2020 Filing 6 DOCUMENT REMOVED AS ENTERED IN ERROR. CDH
August 4, 2020 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr:Initial telephone conference is set for 9/17/2020 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the Courts action herein. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least three business days prior to the initial status and all further status hearings. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. The call-in information for the 9/17/2020 hearing is as follows: Please use the Court's toll-free call-in number 877-336-1829, conference access code is 6963747. Mailed notice (cdh, )
August 3, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Society Insurance (gw, )
July 30, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (daj, )
July 30, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Royalty Banquet Hall, Inc. by Michael S. Agruss (Agruss, Michael)
July 30, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Royalty Banquet Hall, Inc. by Taylor Leigh Kosla (Kosla, Taylor)
July 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Royalty Banquet Hall, Inc. ; jury demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17267822. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kosla, Taylor)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Royalty Banquet Hall, Inc. v. Society Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Royalty Banquet Hall, Inc.
Represented By: Taylor Leigh Kosla
Represented By: Michael S. Agruss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Society Insurance
Represented By: Thomas B. Underwood
Represented By: Michelle Anne Miner
Represented By: Michael Duane Sanders
Represented By: Amy Elizabeth Chesshir Frantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?