Blaylock et al v. Twin Restaurant, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Rachel Anderson, Susan Winfield, Johnae Farr, Andonia Subsits, Stephanie Faynshteyn, Alexandra Pearce, Autumn Sullivan, Brianne Bidochka, Kenneth Biggers, Sonia Santellanes, Caitlyn Temesvary, Alexsandrea Miranda, Bailey Ward, Jessica Mercer, Jennifer Quinn, Sarah Blaylock, Danielle Uphoff, Karena Villegas, Bobbie Peck, Jessica Litavsky, Tashia Moore, Angellyna Sanchez, Daryll Rodriguez, Kamari Evans, Crystal McBride, Lizeth Hurtado, Madison Clements, Brittany Marrotta, Hayley Frank, Kialah Reed, Destiny Rucker, Samantha Fuller, Andrea Mascorro and Russell Willaimson
Defendant: Twin Restaurant Franchise, LLC, Twin Restaurant Warrenville, LLC, Twin Restaurant Investment Company, Twin Restaurant Orland Park, LLC, Consolidated Restaurant Operations, Inc., Twin Restaurant Oakbrook, LLC, Twin Restaurant Frisco, LLC, Twin Restaurant, LLC, Twin Restaurant Wheeling, LLC, TP Franchise Ventures I, LLC, Twin Restaurant Holding, LLC, Doe Corporation, Twin Restaurant Holding, LP, Twin Restaurant Investment Co. II, LLC, Front Burner Restaurants, LP and Twin Restaurant IP, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv04648
Filed: August 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jorge L Alonso
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2003
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17377372. (Attachments: #1 Supplement List of Defendants Represented by Paduano & Weintraub LLP)(Fain, Courtney)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17377297. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Meredith Cavallaro Admissions, #2 Supplement List of Defendants Represented by Paduano & Weintraub LLP)(Cavallaro, Meredith)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants TP Franchise Ventures I, LLC, Twin Restaurant Franchise, LLC, Twin Restaurant Frisco, LLC, Twin Restaurant Holding, LLC, Twin Restaurant Holding, LP, Twin Restaurant IP, LLC, Twin Restaurant Investment Co. II, LLC, Twin Restaurant Investment Company, Twin Restaurant Oakbrook, LLC, Twin Restaurant Orland Park, LLC, Twin Restaurant Warrenville, LLC, Twin Restaurant Wheeling, LLC, Twin Restaurant, LLC by Christopher William Sheekey (Sheekey, Christopher)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants TP Franchise Ventures I, LLC, Twin Restaurant Franchise, LLC, Twin Restaurant Frisco, LLC, Twin Restaurant Holding, LLC, Twin Restaurant Holding, LP, Twin Restaurant IP, LLC, Twin Restaurant Investment Co. II, LLC, Twin Restaurant Investment Company, Twin Restaurant Oakbrook, LLC, Twin Restaurant Orland Park, LLC, Twin Restaurant Warrenville, LLC, Twin Restaurant Wheeling, LLC, Twin Restaurant, LLC by Ines M. Monte (Monte, Ines)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Rachel Anderson, Brianne Bidochka, Kenneth Biggers, Sarah Blaylock, Madison Clements, Kamari Evans, Johnae Farr, Stephanie Faynshteyn, Hayley Frank, Samantha Fuller, Lizeth Hurtado, Jessica Litavsky, Brittany Marrotta, Andrea Mascorro, Crystal McBride, Jessica Mercer, Alexsandrea Miranda, Tashia Moore, Alexandra Pearce, Bobbie Peck, Jennifer Quinn, Kialah Reed, Daryll Rodriguez, Destiny Rucker, Sonia Santellanes, Andonia Subsits, Autumn Sullivan, Caitlyn Temesvary, Danielle Uphoff, Karena Villegas, Bailey Ward, Russell Willaimson, Susan Winfield by Johanna J. Raimond (Raimond, Johanna)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED complaint by Russell Willaimson, Bailey Ward, Jennifer Quinn, Johnae Farr, Sonia Santellanes, Alexsandrea Miranda, Rachel Anderson, Sarah Blaylock, Tashia Moore, Danielle Uphoff, Jessica Mercer, Andonia Subsits, Autumn Sullivan, Bobbie Peck, Andrea Mascorro, Destiny Rucker, Samantha Fuller, Karena Villegas, Lizeth Hurtado, Kialah Reed, Brittany Marrotta, Daryll Rodriguez, Caitlyn Temesvary, Kamari Evans, Brianne Bidochka, Hayley Frank, Jessica Litavsky, Crystal McBride, Stephanie Faynshteyn, Kenneth Biggers, Susan Winfield, Alexandra Pearce, Madison Clements against All Defendants and terminating Angellyna Sanchez (Holder, Tamara)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Holder, Tamara)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Russell Willaimson, Bailey Ward, Jennifer Quinn, Johnae Farr, Sonia Santellanes, Alexsandrea Miranda, Rachel Anderson, Sarah Blaylock, Tashia Moore, Danielle Uphoff, Jessica Mercer, Andonia Subsits, Angellyna Sanchez, Autumn Sullivan, Bobbie Peck, Andrea Mascorro, Destiny Rucker, Samantha Fuller, Karena Villegas, Lizeth Hurtado, Kialah Reed, Brittany Marrotta, Daryll Rodriguez, Caitlyn Temesvary, Kamari Evans, Brianne Bidochka, Hayley Frank, Jessica Litavsky, Crystal McBride, Stephanie Faynshteyn, Kenneth Biggers, Susan Winfield, Alexandra Pearce, Madison Clements; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17293379.(Holder, Tamara)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (gw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blaylock et al v. Twin Restaurant, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Anderson
Represented By: Tamara N. Holder
Represented By: Johanna J. Raimond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Winfield
Represented By: Tamara N. Holder
Represented By: Johanna J. Raimond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnae Farr
Represented By: Tamara N. Holder
Represented By: Johanna J. Raimond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andonia Subsits
Represented By: Tamara N. Holder
Represented By: Johanna J. Raimond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Faynshteyn
Represented By: Tamara N. Holder
Represented By: Johanna J. Raimond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandra Pearce
Represented By: Tamara N. Holder
Represented By: Johanna J. Raimond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Autumn Sullivan
Represented By: Tamara N. Holder
Represented By: Johanna J. Raimond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brianne Bidochka
Represented By: Tamara N. Holder
Represented By: Johanna J. Raimond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Biggers
Represented By: Tamara N. Holder
Represented By: Johanna J. Raimond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonia Santellanes
Represented By: Tamara N. Holder
Represented By: Johanna J. Raimond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caitlyn Temesvary
Represented By: Tamara N. Holder
Represented By: Johanna J. Raimond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexsandrea Miranda
Represented By: Tamara N. Holder
Represented By: Johanna J. Raimond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bailey Ward
Represented By: Tamara N. Holder
Represented By: Johanna J. Raimond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Mercer
Represented By: Tamara N. Holder
Represented By: Johanna J. Raimond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Quinn
Represented By: Tamara N. Holder
Represented By: Johanna J. Raimond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Blaylock
Represented By: Tamara N. Holder
Represented By: Johanna J. Raimond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Uphoff
Represented By: Tamara N. Holder
Represented By: Johanna J. Raimond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karena Villegas
Represented By: Tamara N. Holder
Represented By: Johanna J. Raimond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobbie Peck
Represented By: Tamara N. Holder
Represented By: Johanna J. Raimond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Litavsky
Represented By: Tamara N. Holder
Represented By: Johanna J. Raimond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tashia Moore
Represented By: Tamara N. Holder
Represented By: Johanna J. Raimond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angellyna Sanchez
Represented By: Tamara N. Holder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daryll Rodriguez
Represented By: Tamara N. Holder
Represented By: Johanna J. Raimond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kamari Evans
Represented By: Tamara N. Holder
Represented By: Johanna J. Raimond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal McBride
Represented By: Tamara N. Holder
Represented By: Johanna J. Raimond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lizeth Hurtado
Represented By: Tamara N. Holder
Represented By: Johanna J. Raimond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madison Clements
Represented By: Tamara N. Holder
Represented By: Johanna J. Raimond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Marrotta
Represented By: Tamara N. Holder
Represented By: Johanna J. Raimond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hayley Frank
Represented By: Tamara N. Holder
Represented By: Johanna J. Raimond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kialah Reed
Represented By: Tamara N. Holder
Represented By: Johanna J. Raimond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Destiny Rucker
Represented By: Tamara N. Holder
Represented By: Johanna J. Raimond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Fuller
Represented By: Tamara N. Holder
Represented By: Johanna J. Raimond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Mascorro
Represented By: Tamara N. Holder
Represented By: Johanna J. Raimond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Willaimson
Represented By: Tamara N. Holder
Represented By: Johanna J. Raimond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twin Restaurant Franchise, LLC
Represented By: Courtney Patrice Fain
Represented By: Meredith Brooke Cavallaro
Represented By: Ines M. Monte
Represented By: Christopher William Sheekey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twin Restaurant Warrenville, LLC
Represented By: Courtney Patrice Fain
Represented By: Meredith Brooke Cavallaro
Represented By: Ines M. Monte
Represented By: Christopher William Sheekey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twin Restaurant Investment Company
Represented By: Courtney Patrice Fain
Represented By: Meredith Brooke Cavallaro
Represented By: Ines M. Monte
Represented By: Christopher William Sheekey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twin Restaurant Orland Park, LLC
Represented By: Courtney Patrice Fain
Represented By: Meredith Brooke Cavallaro
Represented By: Ines M. Monte
Represented By: Christopher William Sheekey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consolidated Restaurant Operations, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twin Restaurant Oakbrook, LLC
Represented By: Courtney Patrice Fain
Represented By: Meredith Brooke Cavallaro
Represented By: Ines M. Monte
Represented By: Christopher William Sheekey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twin Restaurant Frisco, LLC
Represented By: Courtney Patrice Fain
Represented By: Meredith Brooke Cavallaro
Represented By: Ines M. Monte
Represented By: Christopher William Sheekey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twin Restaurant, LLC
Represented By: Courtney Patrice Fain
Represented By: Meredith Brooke Cavallaro
Represented By: Ines M. Monte
Represented By: Christopher William Sheekey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twin Restaurant Wheeling, LLC
Represented By: Meredith Brooke Cavallaro
Represented By: Ines M. Monte
Represented By: Christopher William Sheekey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TP Franchise Ventures I, LLC
Represented By: Courtney Patrice Fain
Represented By: Meredith Brooke Cavallaro
Represented By: Ines M. Monte
Represented By: Christopher William Sheekey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twin Restaurant Holding, LLC
Represented By: Courtney Patrice Fain
Represented By: Meredith Brooke Cavallaro
Represented By: Ines M. Monte
Represented By: Christopher William Sheekey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twin Restaurant Holding, LP
Represented By: Courtney Patrice Fain
Represented By: Meredith Brooke Cavallaro
Represented By: Ines M. Monte
Represented By: Christopher William Sheekey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twin Restaurant Investment Co. II, LLC
Represented By: Courtney Patrice Fain
Represented By: Meredith Brooke Cavallaro
Represented By: Ines M. Monte
Represented By: Christopher William Sheekey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Front Burner Restaurants, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twin Restaurant IP, LLC
Represented By: Courtney Patrice Fain
Represented By: Meredith Brooke Cavallaro
Represented By: Ines M. Monte
Represented By: Christopher William Sheekey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?