Cox et al v. Carmichael et al
Plaintiff: Merrill Dill and William Cox
Defendant: Tayfun Tuzun, Frank Forrest, C. Bryan Daniels, Thomas H. Harvey, Nicholas K. Akins, Gary R. Heminger, Emerson L. Brumback, Jorge L. Benitez, Katherine B. Blackburn, Jerry W. Burris, Greg D. Carmichael, Marsha C. Williams, Michael B. Mccallister, B. Evan Bayh, III, Jewell D. Hoover and Eileen A. Mallesch
Case Number: 1:2020cv04660
Filed: August 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara L Ellis
Referring Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1109
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17391228. (Lash, Christopher)
August 25, 2020 Filing 29 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis for all further proceedings pursuant to Local Rule 40.4. Honorable Gary Feinerman no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/25/20. (aee, )
August 20, 2020 Filing 28 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion to appear pro hac vice #27 is granted.; Mailed notice. (jlj, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17342252. (Varindani, Nina)
August 18, 2020 Filing 26 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Fifth Third Bancorp (Smith, Charles)
August 18, 2020 Filing 25 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Nicholas K. Akins, B. Evan Bayh, III, Jorge L. Benitez, Katherine B. Blackburn, Emerson L. Brumback, Jerry W. Burris, Greg D. Carmichael, C. Bryan Daniels, Frank Forrest, Thomas H. Harvey, Gary R. Heminger, Jewell D. Hoover, Eileen A. Mallesch, Michael B. Mccallister, Tayfun Tuzun, Marsha C. Williams, Unknown Fifth Third Bancorp by Daniel James Scime (Scime, Daniel)
August 18, 2020 Filing 24 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Nicholas K. Akins, B. Evan Bayh, III, Jorge L. Benitez, Katherine B. Blackburn, Emerson L. Brumback, Jerry W. Burris, Greg D. Carmichael, C. Bryan Daniels, Frank Forrest, Thomas H. Harvey, Gary R. Heminger, Jewell D. Hoover, Eileen A. Mallesch, Michael B. Mccallister, Tayfun Tuzun, Marsha C. Williams, Unknown Fifth Third Bancorp by Katherine Fletcher Morgan (Morgan, Katherine)
August 18, 2020 Filing 23 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Nicholas K. Akins, B. Evan Bayh, III, Jorge L. Benitez, Katherine B. Blackburn, Emerson L. Brumback, Jerry W. Burris, Greg D. Carmichael, C. Bryan Daniels, Frank Forrest, Thomas H. Harvey, Gary R. Heminger, Jewell D. Hoover, Eileen A. Mallesch, Michael B. Mccallister, Tayfun Tuzun, Marsha C. Williams, Unknown Fifth Third Bancorp by Marcella Louise Lape (Lape, Marcella)
August 18, 2020 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Initial status hearing set for 10/6/2020 #3 is stricken and re-set for 10/28/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Initial Status Report shall be filed by 10/21/2020. Please see Judge Feinerman's web page (http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov) for details on the Initial Status Hearing and Initial Status Report. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the 10/28/2020 hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 21 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Nicholas K. Akins, B. Evan Bayh, III, Jorge L. Benitez, Katherine B. Blackburn, Emerson L. Brumback, Jerry W. Burris, Greg D. Carmichael, C. Bryan Daniels, Frank Forrest, Thomas H. Harvey, Gary R. Heminger, Jewell D. Hoover, Eileen A. Mallesch, Michael B. Mccallister, Tayfun Tuzun, Marsha C. Williams, Unknown Fifth Third Bancorp by Charles F. Smith, Jr (Smith, Charles)
August 17, 2020 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Merrill Dill, William Cox. Marsha C. Williams waiver sent on 8/10/2020, answer due 10/9/2020. (Shamberg, Kyle)
August 17, 2020 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Merrill Dill, William Cox. Tayfun Tuzun waiver sent on 8/10/2020, answer due 10/9/2020. (Shamberg, Kyle)
August 17, 2020 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Merrill Dill, William Cox. Michael B. Mccallister waiver sent on 8/10/2020, answer due 10/9/2020. (Shamberg, Kyle)
August 17, 2020 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Merrill Dill, William Cox. Eileen A. Mallesch waiver sent on 8/10/2020, answer due 10/9/2020. (Shamberg, Kyle)
August 17, 2020 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Merrill Dill, William Cox. Jewell D. Hoover waiver sent on 8/10/2020, answer due 10/9/2020. (Shamberg, Kyle)
August 17, 2020 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Merrill Dill, William Cox. Gary R. Heminger waiver sent on 8/10/2020, answer due 10/9/2020. (Shamberg, Kyle)
August 17, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Merrill Dill, William Cox. Thomas H. Harvey waiver sent on 8/10/2020, answer due 10/9/2020. (Shamberg, Kyle)
August 17, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Merrill Dill, William Cox. Frank Forrest waiver sent on 8/10/2020, answer due 10/9/2020. (Shamberg, Kyle)
August 17, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Merrill Dill, William Cox. Fifth Third Bancorp waiver sent on 8/10/2020, answer due 10/9/2020. (Shamberg, Kyle)
August 17, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Merrill Dill, William Cox. C. Bryan Daniels waiver sent on 8/10/2020, answer due 10/9/2020. (Shamberg, Kyle)
August 17, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Merrill Dill, William Cox. Greg D. Carmichael waiver sent on 8/10/2020, answer due 10/9/2020. (Shamberg, Kyle)
August 17, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Merrill Dill, William Cox. Jerry W. Burris waiver sent on 8/10/2020, answer due 10/9/2020. (Shamberg, Kyle)
August 17, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Merrill Dill, William Cox. Emerson L. Brumback waiver sent on 8/10/2020, answer due 10/9/2020. (Shamberg, Kyle)
August 17, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Merrill Dill, William Cox. Katherine B. Blackburn waiver sent on 8/10/2020, answer due 10/9/2020. (Shamberg, Kyle)
August 17, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Merrill Dill, William Cox. Jorge L. Benitez waiver sent on 8/10/2020, answer due 10/9/2020. (Shamberg, Kyle)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Merrill Dill, William Cox. B. Evan Bayh, III waiver sent on 8/10/2020, answer due 10/9/2020. (Shamberg, Kyle)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Merrill Dill, William Cox. Nicholas K. Akins waiver sent on 8/10/2020, answer due 10/9/2020. (Shamberg, Kyle)
August 11, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Initial status hearing set for 10/6/2020 at 9:30 a.m. Initial Status Report shall be filed by 9/29/2020. Please see Judge Feinerman's web page (http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov) for details on the Initial Status Hearing and Initial Status Report. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the 10/6/2020 hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
August 7, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Shamberg, Kyle)
August 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Merrill Dill, William Cox; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17294193. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Verification of Merrill Dill, #2 Exhibit Verification of Merrill Dill)(Shamberg, Kyle)
August 7, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (gw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox et al v. Carmichael et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tayfun Tuzun
Represented By: Charles F. Smith, Jr.
Represented By: Marcella Louise Lape
Represented By: Katherine Fletcher Morgan
Represented By: Daniel James Scime
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Forrest
Represented By: Charles F. Smith, Jr.
Represented By: Marcella Louise Lape
Represented By: Katherine Fletcher Morgan
Represented By: Daniel James Scime
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Bryan Daniels
Represented By: Charles F. Smith, Jr.
Represented By: Marcella Louise Lape
Represented By: Katherine Fletcher Morgan
Represented By: Daniel James Scime
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas H. Harvey
Represented By: Charles F. Smith, Jr.
Represented By: Marcella Louise Lape
Represented By: Katherine Fletcher Morgan
Represented By: Daniel James Scime
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas K. Akins
Represented By: Charles F. Smith, Jr.
Represented By: Marcella Louise Lape
Represented By: Katherine Fletcher Morgan
Represented By: Daniel James Scime
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary R. Heminger
Represented By: Charles F. Smith, Jr.
Represented By: Marcella Louise Lape
Represented By: Katherine Fletcher Morgan
Represented By: Daniel James Scime
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emerson L. Brumback
Represented By: Charles F. Smith, Jr.
Represented By: Marcella Louise Lape
Represented By: Katherine Fletcher Morgan
Represented By: Daniel James Scime
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge L. Benitez
Represented By: Charles F. Smith, Jr.
Represented By: Marcella Louise Lape
Represented By: Katherine Fletcher Morgan
Represented By: Daniel James Scime
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine B. Blackburn
Represented By: Charles F. Smith, Jr.
Represented By: Marcella Louise Lape
Represented By: Katherine Fletcher Morgan
Represented By: Daniel James Scime
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry W. Burris
Represented By: Charles F. Smith, Jr.
Represented By: Marcella Louise Lape
Represented By: Katherine Fletcher Morgan
Represented By: Daniel James Scime
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg D. Carmichael
Represented By: Charles F. Smith, Jr.
Represented By: Marcella Louise Lape
Represented By: Katherine Fletcher Morgan
Represented By: Daniel James Scime
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marsha C. Williams
Represented By: Charles F. Smith, Jr.
Represented By: Marcella Louise Lape
Represented By: Katherine Fletcher Morgan
Represented By: Daniel James Scime
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael B. Mccallister
Represented By: Charles F. Smith, Jr.
Represented By: Marcella Louise Lape
Represented By: Katherine Fletcher Morgan
Represented By: Daniel James Scime
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Evan Bayh, III
Represented By: Charles F. Smith, Jr.
Represented By: Marcella Louise Lape
Represented By: Katherine Fletcher Morgan
Represented By: Daniel James Scime
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jewell D. Hoover
Represented By: Charles F. Smith, Jr.
Represented By: Marcella Louise Lape
Represented By: Katherine Fletcher Morgan
Represented By: Daniel James Scime
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eileen A. Mallesch
Represented By: Charles F. Smith, Jr.
Represented By: Marcella Louise Lape
Represented By: Katherine Fletcher Morgan
Represented By: Daniel James Scime
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merrill Dill
Represented By: Kyle Alan Shamberg
Represented By: Nina Varindani
Represented By: Christopher M. Lash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Cox
Represented By: Kyle Alan Shamberg
Represented By: Nina Varindani
Represented By: Christopher M. Lash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?