Mid-West Institutional Food Distributors, Inc. d/b/a Midwest Foods v. Prominence Hospitality Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Mid-West Institutional Food Distributors, Inc. d/b/a Midwest Foods and Mid-West Institutional Food Distributors, Inc. an Indiana corporation doing business as Midwest Foods
Defendant: Prominence Hospitality Group, LLC, Bimal Doshi, Rena Rehan Zaid, Prominence Rosemont, LLC and Prominence Rosemont, LLC an Illinois limited liability company doing business as Hyatt Rosemont
Case Number: 1:2020cv04669
Filed: August 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Manish S Shah
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Any objections to the motion for default judgment must be properly filed by 10/2/20. If no objections are filed, the motion will be considered unopposed. Notices mailed. (psm, )
September 24, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION by Plaintiff Mid-West Institutional Food Distributors, Inc. for default judgment as to all Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Wunder, Christopher)
September 14, 2020 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Defendants have failed to appear and have failed to respond to this court's order for rule to show cause #17 . An order of default is entered against defendants Prominence Hospitality Group, LLC, Prominence Rosemont, LLC, Rena Rehan Zaid, and Bimal Doshi. Plaintiff has leave to file a motion for default judgment when prepared to do so. Notices mailed. (psm, )
August 31, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of Service for court's August 27, 2020 order (as directed by the court) by Christopher S. Wunder on behalf of Mid-West Institutional Food Distributors, Inc. regarding order on rule to show cause,,, terminate motions,, #17 (Wunder, Christopher)
August 27, 2020 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Plaintiff's motion for a rule to show cause #16 is granted. Defendants shall show cause why they should not be held in contempt by filing a written statement by 9/10/20. Plaintiff shall serve this order on defendants. The court notes that defendants' answers to the complaint are due by 9/1/20 and the failure to appear will result in an entry of default. In the event a default judgment is entered, plaintiff will have full recourse to collection proceedings to attach defendants' assets to collect on any judgment that is entered in plaintiff's favor. Notices mailed. (psm, )
August 26, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION by Plaintiff Mid-West Institutional Food Distributors, Inc. for rule to show cause against Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Wunder, Christopher)
August 25, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mid-West Institutional Food Distributors, Inc. as to Rena Rehan Zaid on 8/18/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (Wunder, Christopher)
August 14, 2020 Filing 14 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Order. Signed by the Honorable Manish S. Shah on 8/14/2020. Notices mailed. (psm, )
August 14, 2020 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Motion hearing held by telephone. For the reasons stated on the record, plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction #6 is granted. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to send a proposed order granting the Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Order to proposed_order_shah@ilnd.uscourts.gov. Notices mailed. (psm, )
August 13, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Service by personal service as to Defendant Prominence Rosemont, LLC, Prominence Hospitality Group, LLC, and Bimal Doshi by Christopher S. Wunder on behalf of Mid-West Institutional Food Distributors, Inc. regarding MOTION by Plaintiff Mid-West Institutional Food Distributors, Inc. for temporary restraining order against Defendant Prominence Rosemont, LLC #6 , set/reset hearings,,, #7 (Wunder, Christopher)
August 13, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Service by overnight delivery by Christopher S. Wunder on behalf of Mid-West Institutional Food Distributors, Inc. regarding MOTION by Plaintiff Mid-West Institutional Food Distributors, Inc. for temporary restraining order against Defendant Prominence Rosemont, LLC #6 , set/reset hearings,,, #7 (Wunder, Christopher)
August 13, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mid-West Institutional Food Distributors, Inc. as to Prominence Rosemont, LLC on 8/11/2020, answer due 9/1/2020. (Wunder, Christopher)
August 13, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mid-West Institutional Food Distributors, Inc. as to Prominence Hospitality Group, LLC on 8/11/2020, answer due 9/1/2020. (Wunder, Christopher)
August 13, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mid-West Institutional Food Distributors, Inc. as to Bimal Doshi on 8/10/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. (Wunder, Christopher) (Docket text modified by clerk's office on 8/14/2020) (ec,).
August 10, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Hearing on plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction #6 is set for 8/14/20 at 10:00 a.m. The hearing shall proceed by telephone. Members of the public and media may listen to these proceedings by dialing 1-888-204-5984 and using access code 9146677. Counsel of record and other essential case participants will receive an email prior to the start of the telephone hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Notices mailed. (psm, )
August 10, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiff Mid-West Institutional Food Distributors, Inc. for temporary restraining order against Defendant Prominence Rosemont, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Wunder, Christopher)
August 10, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mid-West Institutional Food Distributors, Inc. d/b/a Midwest Foods by Eric D Kaplan (Kaplan, Eric)
August 10, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Bimal Doshi, Prominence Hospitality Group, LLC, Prominence Rosemont, LLC, Rena Rehan Zaid (mp, )
August 7, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mid-West Institutional Food Distributors, Inc. d/b/a Midwest Foods by Christopher S. Wunder (Wunder, Christopher)
August 7, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Wunder, Christopher)
August 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Mid-West Institutional Food Distributors, Inc. d/b/a Midwest Foods; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17295682. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Wunder, Christopher)
August 7, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mid-West Institutional Food Distributors, Inc. d/b/a Midwest Foods v. Prominence Hospitality Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prominence Hospitality Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bimal Doshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rena Rehan Zaid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prominence Rosemont, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prominence Rosemont, LLC an Illinois limited liability company doing business as Hyatt Rosemont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mid-West Institutional Food Distributors, Inc. d/b/a Midwest Foods
Represented By: Christopher S. Wunder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mid-West Institutional Food Distributors, Inc. an Indiana corporation doing business as Midwest Foods
Represented By: Christopher S. Wunder
Represented By: Eric D Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?