Potter et al v. Madigan et al
Plaintiff: Ms Robin Hawkins, Raymond Simpson, Anne Potter, Robert Dillon, Denise Yarborough, Got It Maid, Inc. and Robin Hawkins
Defendant: Jay Doherty, Michael Madigan, Michael McClain, Commonwealth Edison Company, Exelon Corporation, Law Firm A, Madigan Associates 4-20, Madigan Associate 1, Madigan Associate 2, Michael R. Zalewski, Jay Doherty & Associates, Anne Pramaggiore, Fidel Marquez, Pass-Thru Companies 1-10, John Hooker, Pass-Thru Companies, Michael Zalewski, Law Firm and Madigan
Case Number: 1:2020cv04675
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara L Ellis
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial telephonic status conference in this matter is set for 11/6/2020 at 9:30 AM. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 10/28/2020. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is (866) 434-5269 and the access code is 8087837. Counsel of record will receive an email the morning of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (rj, )
September 3, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Jay Doherty & Associates, Fidel Marquez (jg, )
September 3, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Commonwealth Edison Company, Exelon Corporation by Gayle Littleton (Littleton, Gayle)
September 3, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Commonwealth Edison Company, Exelon Corporation by E. Glenn Rippie (Rippie, E.)
September 3, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Commonwealth Edison Company, Exelon Corporation by Terrence Joseph Truax (Truax, Terrence)
August 19, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Commonwealth Edison Company, Jay Doherty, Exelon Corporation, John Hooker, Michael Madigan, Michael McClain, Anne Pramaggiore, Michael Zalewski (exr, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Robert Dillon, Got It Maid, Inc., Robin Hawkins, Anne Potter, Raymond Simpson, Denise Yarborough by Patrick N. Giordano (Giordano, Patrick)
August 18, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Robert Dillon, Got It Maid, Inc., Robin Hawkins, Anne Potter, Raymond Simpson, Denise Yarborough by Paul G. Neilan (Neilan, Paul)
August 17, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Robert Dillon, Got It Maid, Inc., Robin Hawkins, Anne Potter, Raymond Simpson, Denise Yarborough by Stuart Jay Chanen (Chanen, Stuart)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Robert Dillon, Got It Maid, Inc., Robin Hawkins, Anne Potter, Raymond Simpson, Denise Yarborough by Ariel Olstein (Olstein, Ariel)
August 10, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (daj, )
August 10, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Olstein, Ariel)
August 10, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with corrections filed by Robin Hawkins; Jury Demand. (Olstein, Ariel)
August 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Raymond Simpson, Anne Potter, Denise Yarborough, Got It Maid, Inc., Robert Dillon, Robin Hawkins; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17297130. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Deferred Prosecution Agreeement, #2 Exhibit 2 - 2011 L. Madigan "ComEd Smart Risk", #3 Exhibit 3 - EIMA Quinn Veto Message, #4 Exhibit 4 - 2016 Geiger, "Exelon surtaxes", #5 Exhibit 5 - 2019-4-3 ComEd Section 14(c))(Olstein, Ariel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Potter et al v. Madigan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms Robin Hawkins
Represented By: Ariel Olstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Simpson
Represented By: Ariel Olstein
Represented By: Stuart Jay Chanen
Represented By: Paul G. Neilan
Represented By: Patrick N. Giordano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne Potter
Represented By: Ariel Olstein
Represented By: Stuart Jay Chanen
Represented By: Paul G. Neilan
Represented By: Patrick N. Giordano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Dillon
Represented By: Ariel Olstein
Represented By: Stuart Jay Chanen
Represented By: Paul G. Neilan
Represented By: Patrick N. Giordano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Yarborough
Represented By: Ariel Olstein
Represented By: Stuart Jay Chanen
Represented By: Paul G. Neilan
Represented By: Patrick N. Giordano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Got It Maid, Inc.
Represented By: Ariel Olstein
Represented By: Stuart Jay Chanen
Represented By: Paul G. Neilan
Represented By: Patrick N. Giordano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Hawkins
Represented By: Ariel Olstein
Represented By: Stuart Jay Chanen
Represented By: Paul G. Neilan
Represented By: Patrick N. Giordano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Doherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Madigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth Edison Company
Represented By: Terrence Joseph Truax
Represented By: Gayle Littleton
Represented By: E. Glenn Rippie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exelon Corporation
Represented By: Terrence Joseph Truax
Represented By: Gayle Littleton
Represented By: E. Glenn Rippie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Firm A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madigan Associates 4-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madigan Associate 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madigan Associate 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael R. Zalewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Doherty & Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Pramaggiore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidel Marquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pass-Thru Companies 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hooker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pass-Thru Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Zalewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Firm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?