Advantage Funding Commercial Capital Corp. v. Parks
Plaintiff: Advantage Funding Commercial Capital Corp.
Defendant: Samuel Parks doing business as JAG TTT doing business as P.J. LUXURY LINER,
Case Number: 1:2020cv04824
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Advantage Funding Commercial Capital Corp. as to Samuel Parks on 8/23/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Porras, Cecilio)
August 18, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Samuel Parks (exr, )
August 18, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. FEE DUE, NO INFORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION SUBMITTED. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cp, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Advantage Funding Commercial Capital Corp. by Cecilio Ivan Porras (Porras, Cecilio)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Advantage Funding Commercial Capital Corp. by David Alexander Darcy (Darcy, David)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT 0752-17336856 filed by Advantage Funding Commercial Capital Corp.; (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1-4, #3 Exhibit Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Darcy, David)
July 10, 2020 Filing 4 Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020. Mailed notice. (pj, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Advantage Funding Commercial Capital Corp. v. Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Advantage Funding Commercial Capital Corp.
Represented By: David Alexander Darcy
Represented By: Cecilio Ivan Porras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Parks doing business as JAG TTT doing business as P.J. LUXURY LINER,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?