TCF Inventory Finance, Inc. v. Karolina Koaches Inc. et al
Plaintiff: TCF Inventory Finance, Inc.
Defendant: Karolina Koaches Inc. and Stephen Scott Brooks
Case Number: 1:2020cv04826
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Z Lee
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Status hearing held on 10/8/20. Defendant's response to the motion for default judgment #10 and the motion for attorney fees #11 is due by 10/15/20. The motions are entered and continued for 10/21/20 at 9:00 a.m. Counsel should provide a copy of the order to the Defendant by first class mail. In light of the COVID-19 pandemic and the related General Orders, the Court finds that it is necessary to conduct the motion hearing via telephone conference. The call-in number is 888-273-3658 and the access code is 1637578. Counsel of record will receive a separate email at least 12 hours prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions on how to join the call. All persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in court-imposed sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. All participants should review the Court's standing order regarding telephone conferences that is on Judge Lee's website, which can be found at: https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?4Qf5zc8loCI5U7rfMP9DHw==Mailed notice (ca, )
October 7, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION by Plaintiff TCF Inventory Finance, Inc. for attorney fees (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bay, William)
October 7, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION by Plaintiff TCF Inventory Finance, Inc. for default judgment as to Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bay, William)
October 5, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:The Court has reviewed the status report. Plaintiff states that Defendants have failed to timely appear or file a responsive pleading. If Plaintiff wishes to file a motion for default, it should do so before 10/8/20, the date of the next status hearing. Mailed notice (ca, )
October 1, 2020 Filing 8 STATUS Report (Initial) by TCF Inventory Finance, Inc. (Bay, William)
September 15, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TCF Inventory Finance, Inc. as to Stephen Scott Brooks on 9/8/2020, answer due 9/29/2020. (Bay, William)
September 15, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TCF Inventory Finance, Inc. as to Karolina Koaches Inc. on 9/8/2020, answer due 9/29/2020. (Bay, William)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: A Rule 16 initial status hearing is set for 10/8/20 at 8:45 a.m. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report by 10/1/20. The report should comply with the requirements for initial joint status reports set forth in the Initial Status Conference standing order, which can be found on the Court's website. In light of the COVID-19 pandemic and the related General Orders, the Court finds that it is necessary to conduct the status hearing via telephone conference. The call-in number is 888-273-3658 and the access code is 1637578. Counsel of record will receive a separate email at least 12 hours prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions on how to join the call. All persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in court-imposed sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. All participants should review the Court's standing order regarding telephone conferences that is on Judge Lee's website, which can be found at: https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?4Qf5zc8loCI5U7rfMP9DHw==Mailed notice (ca, )
August 18, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Stephen Scott Brooks, Karolina Koaches Inc. (exr, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TCF Inventory Finance, Inc. by Holly Hannah Campbell (Campbell, Holly)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff TCF Inventory Finance, Inc. by William Robert Bay (Bay, William)
August 18, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cp, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by TCF Inventory Finance, Inc.; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17336431. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Declaration Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Bay, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TCF Inventory Finance, Inc. v. Karolina Koaches Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karolina Koaches Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Scott Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TCF Inventory Finance, Inc.
Represented By: Holly Hannah Campbell
Represented By: William Robert Bay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?