Mid-West Institutional Food Distributors, Inc. v. Pipeline-West Suburban Medical Center, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Mid-West Institutional Food Distributors, Inc. d/b/a Midwest Foods and Mid-West Institutional Food Distributors, Inc. doing business as Midwest Foods, an Indiana corporation
Defendant: Joseph Ottolino, Pipeline-West Suburban Medical Center, LLC d/b/a West Suburban Medical Center and Pipeline-West Suburban Medical Center, LLC doing business as West Suburban Medical Center, a Delaware limited liability company
Case Number: 1:2020cv04831
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Rebecca R Pallmeyer
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Plaintiff is directed to file a status report by 10/28/2020. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 8/20/2020. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Telephone motion hearing held. Plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order #5 is granted to 9/3/2020 at 3:00 p.m. Enter Order Granting Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Telephone hearing on Plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order #5 set for 8/20/2020 at 3:00 p.m. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is 877-336-1839 and the access code is 6708061. Counsel of record will receive an email 10 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
August 18, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Joseph Ottolino (jn, )
August 18, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Pipeline-West Suburban Medical Center, LLC d/b/a West Suburban Medical Center (jn, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiff Mid-West Institutional Food Distributors, Inc. d/b/a Midwest Foods for temporary restraining order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Serritella, William)
August 18, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather M. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (gw, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mid-West Institutional Food Distributors, Inc. d/b/a Midwest Foods by Nicollette Liv Khuans (Khuans, Nicollette)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mid-West Institutional Food Distributors, Inc. d/b/a Midwest Foods by William J. Serritella, Jr (Serritella, William)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Serritella, William)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Mid-West Institutional Food Distributors, Inc. d/b/a Midwest Foods; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17337423. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Serritella, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mid-West Institutional Food Distributors, Inc. v. Pipeline-West Suburban Medical Center, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Ottolino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pipeline-West Suburban Medical Center, LLC d/b/a West Suburban Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pipeline-West Suburban Medical Center, LLC doing business as West Suburban Medical Center, a Delaware limited liability company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mid-West Institutional Food Distributors, Inc. d/b/a Midwest Foods
Represented By: Nicollette Liv Khuans
Represented By: William J. Serritella, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mid-West Institutional Food Distributors, Inc. doing business as Midwest Foods, an Indiana corporation
Represented By: Nicollette Liv Khuans
Represented By: William J. Serritella, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?