Hernandez et al v. Duharkic et al
Plaintiff: Jamie C Hernandez
Defendant: Amanda Gallegos, Duran, Rochelle Parker, R Korkes, Super Intendent, A. Duharkic, J Chavez and Thomas J. Dart
Case Number: 1:2020cv04837
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jorge L Alonso
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 MAILED three blank USM-285 forms, Magistrate Judge Consent form, Filing Instructions, and Order dated 09/25/2020 to Jamie C Hernandez. (rc, )
September 25, 2020 MAILED Order dated 09/25/2020 to Cook County Jail trust Fund Officer, and Clerk's Office Fiscal Department. (rc, )
September 25, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants A. Duharkic, Duran, R Korkes. (rc, )
September 25, 2020 Filing 7 COMPLAINT filed by Jamie C Hernandez; Jury Demand. (rc, )
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is granted. The Court orders the trust fund officer at Plaintiff's place of incarceration to deduct $37.83 from Plaintiff's account for payment to the Clerk of Court as an initial partial payment of the filing fee and to continue making monthly deductions in accordance with this order. The Court directs the Clerk of Court to send a copy of this order (electronically if possible) to the trust fund officer at the facility having custody of Plaintiff and to this court's fiscal department. The Court also directs the Clerk to: (1) file Plaintiff's complaint #1 , pages 1-12 and 16 only; (2) issue summonses for service of the filed complaint on Defendants Duharkic, Duran, and Korkes by the U.S. Marshal; (3) terminate all remaining defendants to this action; and (4) send Plaintiff three blank USM-285 (Marshal service) forms, a magistrate judge consent form, filing instructions, and a copy of this order. Plaintiff must complete and return USM-285 forms for service on Defendants Duharkic, Duran, and Korkes. Failure to return the completed USM-285 forms by October 22, 2020, may result in dismissal of any unserved Defendants as well as dismissal of this case in its entirety. Plaintiff also is advised that he must promptly submit a change-of- address notification if he is transferred to another facility or released. Failure to keep the Court advised of his address may result in dismissal of this action for failure to comply with a Court order and for want of prosecution. The Court appoints the U.S. Marshal to serve Defendants Duharkic, Duran, and Korkes. Plaintiff's motion for attorney representation #4 , which shows that he has made no effort to obtain counsel on his own, is denied. See Pruitt v. Mote, 503 F.3d 647, 654-55 (7th Cir. 2007) (en banc); Russell v. Bukowski, 608 Fed. App'x 426, 428 (7th Cir. 2015) ("[B]efore a district court is required to consider recruiting counsel to assist a litigant in a civil case, the litigant must make a reasonable attempt to secure counsel for himself."). Signed by the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso on 9/25/2020: Mailed notice (rc, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Jamie C Hernandez for attorney representation. (rc, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Jamie C Hernandez for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (Exhibits) (rc, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (rc, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and 0 copies by Jamie C Hernandez. (Exhibits) (Envelope postmarked 08/12/2020) (rc, )
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020. Mailed notice. (rc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez et al v. Duharkic et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Gallegos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rochelle Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Korkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Super Intendent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Duharkic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Chavez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas J. Dart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie C Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?