Meeky v. City of Chicago et al
Plaintiff: Melvin Meeky
Defendant: City of Chicago and Chicago Police Department
Case Number: 1:2020cv04843
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 9 ENTERED JUDGMENT. Mailed notice(mc, )
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER : For the reasons set forth below, this case is dismissed with prejudice. The status hearing set for 10/28/2020 #6 is stricken. Enter judgment order. This dismissal counts as a dismissal under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). Civil case closed. Signed by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 10/13/2020. Mailed notice(mc, )
September 25, 2020 Filing 7 RECEIVED Amended Complaint under the constitution (Bivens Action) Title 28 section 1331 U.S. code (Federal Defendant) by Melvin Meeky. (Envelope postmarked 9/22/2020). (mc, )
September 9, 2020 EMAILED order dated 9/9/2020, #6 to Supervisor of the Inmate Trust Fund Accounts at Cook County Jail (mc, )
September 9, 2020 MAILED Plaintiff an amended complaint form, filing instructions, and a copy of the order dated 9/9/2020. (mc, )
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is granted. The court orders the trust fund officer at Plaintiff's place of incarceration to deduct $12.83 from Plaintiff's account for payment to the Clerk of Court as an initial partial payment of the filing fee and to continue making monthly deductions in accordance with this order. The court directs the Clerk of Court to send a copy of this order (electronically if possible) to the trust fund officer at Cook County Jail and to this court's fiscal department. For the reasons set forth below, the complaint #1 is dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim. If Plaintiff wants to proceed with this lawsuit, he must submit an amended complaint by 10/7/2020. Failure to comply will result in dismissal with prejudice of this lawsuit. Plaintiff's motion for attorney representation #4 is denied without prejudice because it does not reflect that he has made reasonable effort to obtain counsel on his own. See Pruitt v. Mote, 503 F.3d 647, 654-55 (7th Cir. 2007) (en banc); Russell v. Bukowski, 608 F. App'x 426, 428 (7th Cir. 2015). The Clerk of Court is directed to send Plaintiff an amended complaint form, filing instructions, and a copy of this order. Status hearing set for 10/28/2020 at 9:50 a.m. Signed by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 9/9/2020. Mailed notice(mc, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Melvin Meeky for attorney assistance. (lma, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Melvin Meeky for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Attachment) (lma, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (lma, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by Melvin Meeky. (Envelope postmarked 8/13/2020) (lma, )
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020. Mailed notice. (lma, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meeky v. City of Chicago et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Meeky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?