Chavez v. Pure's Food Specialties LLC et al
Plaintiff: Omar Adrian Chavez
Defendant: David Code, Robert Gee Sr., Steve R. Brown, Bradley Pure, Jonathan Pure, Pure's Food Specialties LLC and Timothy Hakin
Case Number: 1:2020cv04844
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Durkin
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Steve R. Brown, David Code, Robert Gee Sr., Timothy Hakin, Bradley Pure, Jonathan Pure, Pure's Food Specialties LLC by Michael Kim Chropowicz (Chropowicz, Michael)
October 13, 2020 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Steve R. Brown, David Code, Robert Gee Sr., Timothy Hakin, Bradley Pure, Jonathan Pure, Pure's Food Specialties LLC by Kerryann Marie Haase (Haase, Kerryann)
October 13, 2020 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Steve R. Brown, David Code, Robert Gee Sr., Timothy Hakin, Bradley Pure, Jonathan Pure, Pure's Food Specialties LLC by Brian P Paul (Paul, Brian)
August 27, 2020 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: A joint status report is to be filed by 10/27/2020. Instructions may be found on Judge Durkin's webpage under new and reassigned cases. Mailed notice. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
August 20, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Omar Adrian Chavez. Pure's Food Specialties LLC waiver sent on 8/20/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (Dore, James)
August 20, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Omar Adrian Chavez. Jonathan Pure waiver sent on 8/20/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (Dore, James)
August 20, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Omar Adrian Chavez. Bradley Pure waiver sent on 8/20/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (Dore, James)
August 20, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Omar Adrian Chavez. Timothy Hakin waiver sent on 8/20/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (Dore, James)
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Omar Adrian Chavez. Robert Gee Sr. waiver sent on 8/20/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (Dore, James)
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Omar Adrian Chavez. David Code waiver sent on 8/20/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (Dore, James)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Omar Adrian Chavez. Steve R. Brown waiver sent on 8/20/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (Dore, James)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Omar Adrian Chavez by Daniel I Schlade (Schlade, Daniel)
August 18, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Pure's Food Specialties LLC (exr, )
August 18, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cp, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Dore, James)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Omar Adrian Chavez by James M. Dore (Dore, James)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Omar Adrian Chavez; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17338963.(Dore, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chavez v. Pure's Food Specialties LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Code
Represented By: Michael Kim Chropowicz
Represented By: Kerryann Marie Haase
Represented By: Brian P Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Gee Sr.
Represented By: Michael Kim Chropowicz
Represented By: Kerryann Marie Haase
Represented By: Brian P Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve R. Brown
Represented By: Michael Kim Chropowicz
Represented By: Kerryann Marie Haase
Represented By: Brian P Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley Pure
Represented By: Michael Kim Chropowicz
Represented By: Kerryann Marie Haase
Represented By: Brian P Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Pure
Represented By: Michael Kim Chropowicz
Represented By: Kerryann Marie Haase
Represented By: Brian P Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pure's Food Specialties LLC
Represented By: Michael Kim Chropowicz
Represented By: Kerryann Marie Haase
Represented By: Brian P Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Hakin
Represented By: Michael Kim Chropowicz
Represented By: Kerryann Marie Haase
Represented By: Brian P Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omar Adrian Chavez
Represented By: Daniel I Schlade
Represented By: James M. Dore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?