Garcia v. Filin et al
Plaintiff: Juan Garcia
Defendant: Al Filan, Today's Temptations, Inc. and Al Filin
Case Number: 1:2020cv04846
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Manish S Shah
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Al Filin, Today's Temptations, Inc. by Amy E. Johnson (Johnson, Amy)
October 8, 2020 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion for leave to file #11 is granted. Defendant Filin's answer #8 is withdrawn and all defendants have until 11/5/20 to file a responsive pleading. The parties' joint initial status report is now due 11/9/20. Notices mailed. (psm, )
October 7, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion by Amy E. Johnson for presentment of motion for leave to file #11 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 10/14/2020 at 09:45 AM. (Johnson, Amy)
October 7, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION by Defendants Al Filin, Today's Temptations, Inc. for leave to file Appearance, an Extension of Time and Other Relief (Johnson, Amy)
September 24, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The status report deadline is reset to 10/9/20. Notices mailed. (psm, )
September 14, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Defendant Filin submitted a document that is an attempt to answer the complaint. Corporations cannot appear in federal court without an attorney, so the document is ineffective as to defendant Today's Temptations Inc. Plaintiff's counsel shall confer with defendant Filin and file a joint initial status report by 9/25/20. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Shah's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conferences.' Notices mailed. (psm, )
September 8, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER/Response to Complaint/Petition by Al Filin, Today's Temptations, Inc. (jh, ) (Incorrect Case Number on Document)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Juan Garcia as to Today's Temptations, Inc. on 8/20/2020, answer due 9/10/2020. (Schlade, Daniel)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Juan Garcia as to Al Filan on 8/20/2020, answer due 9/10/2020. (Schlade, Daniel)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Juan Garcia by James M. Dore (Dore, James)
August 18, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Al Filan, Today's Temptations, Inc. (exr, )
August 18, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cp, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Juan Garcia by Daniel I Schlade (Schlade, Daniel)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Schlade, Daniel)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Juan Garcia; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17339181.(Schlade, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Filin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Garcia
Represented By: Daniel I Schlade
Represented By: James M. Dore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Al Filan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Today's Temptations, Inc.
Represented By: Amy E. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Al Filin
Represented By: Amy E. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?