Chapman Associates General Business, Inc. v Springer et al
Plaintiff: Chapman Associates General Business, Inc., Mark Springer, Double M Trucking, Inc. and D&G, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv04849
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 11 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Chapman Associates General Business, Inc. re complaint #1 (Johnson, Wesley)
October 9, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures shall be served by 10/15/2020. Written discovery requests shall be served by 11/30/2020. Motions to amend the pleadings or add new parties shall be filed by 2/15/2021. Fact discovery shall close 4/15/2021. Dispositive motions shall be filed by 5/31/2021. The status hearing set for 10/15/2020 #4 is stricken and re-set for 1/15/2021 at 9:00 a.m. By 1/8/2021, the parties shall file a joint status report addressing: (1) the discovery they have completed; (2) the discovery that remains to be taken; (3) any foreseeable obstacles to meeting the deadlines set forth in this order; (4) whether both sides would like a settlement conference with the Magistrate Judge; and (5) whether there is a need for the 1/15/2021 status hearing. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
October 8, 2020 Filing 9 STATUS Report Initial Joint Status Report by Chapman Associates General Business, Inc. (Johnson, Wesley)
September 29, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by All Defendants re answer to complaint #7 Notice of Filing and Certificate (Moody, Michael)
September 29, 2020 Filing 7 Defendants ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by D&G, Inc., Double M Trucking, Inc., Mark Springer(Moody, Michael)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants D&G, Inc., Double M Trucking, Inc., Mark Springer by Michael C. Moody (Zike Yang Hodges a/k/a Ariel Zike Yang Hodges) (Moody, Michael)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants D&G, Inc., Double M Trucking, Inc., Mark Springer by Michael C. Moody (Moody, Michael)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Initial status hearing set for 10/15/2020 at 9:15 a.m. Initial Status Report shall be filed by 10/8/2020. Please see Judge Feinerman's web page (http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov)for details on the Initial Status Hearing and Initial Status Report. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
August 19, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (gw, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Johnson, Wesley)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Chapman Associates General Business, Inc.; JURY DEMAND. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17339962. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Johnson, Wesley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chapman Associates General Business, Inc. v Springer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chapman Associates General Business, Inc.
Represented By: Wesley E. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Springer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Double M Trucking, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D&G, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?