Hoard v. Saul
Plaintiff: Crystal Hoard
Defendant: Andrew Marshall Saul
Case Number: 1:2020cv04850
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Heather K McShain
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Heather K. McShain: Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to file answer and administrative record #11 is granted. Answer and administrative record due to be filed by 12/15/2020. Mailed notice. (pk, )
October 13, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION by Defendant Andrew Marshall Saul for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Przywara, Kathleen)
September 23, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Heather K. McShain: The case has been reassigned to this Court on consent #8 . Plaintiff's brief in support of reversing or remanding the decision subject to review is due within 60 days of the filing of the administrative record (no motion required). The Social Security Administration's motion to affirm the decision subject to review and its brief in support are due 45 days after plaintiff's brief is filed. Plaintiff's reply brief, if any, is due 14 days after defendant's brief is filed. No oversized briefs will be allowed without prior court approval obtained at least one week before the due date and upon good cause shown. Mailed notice. (pk, )
September 23, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Heather K. McShain: Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis #4 is granted. This action (1) is neither frivolous nor malicious; (2) states a claim on which relief may be granted; and (3) seeks damages against a defendant who is not immune from such relief. 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i)-(iii). See also Manning v. Arizona, No. 12 C 1019, 2012 WL 1161506, at *1 (N.D. Ill. Apr. 9, 2012). In addition, the facts set forth in Plaintiff's affidavit demonstrate that Plaintiff has met the burden of establishing indigence. Mailed notice. (pk, )
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING Case to the Honorable Heather K. McShain, pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(C) for all further proceedings, parties having consented to the reassignment. Honorable Judge Martha M. Pacold no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 9/21/20. (aee, )
September 18, 2020 Filing 7 JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Schultz, Barry)
September 8, 2020 Filing 6 DESIGNATION of Kathleen M. Przywara as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Andrew Marshall Saul (Przywara, Kathleen)
August 19, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cp, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Crystal Hoard for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Schultz, Barry)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Crystal Hoard by Barry Alan Schultz (Schultz, Barry)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Schultz, Barry)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 RECEIVED COMPLAINT filed by Crystal Hoard; (Attachments: #1 AC decision)(Schultz, Barry) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 8/19/2020 (jh, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoard v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Hoard
Represented By: Barry Alan Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Marshall Saul
Represented By: Kathleen M. Przywara
Represented By: AUSA-SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?