Dughetti v. I.D.O.C. et al
Plaintiff: Eric Robert Dughetti
Defendant: I.D.O.C., Rob Jeffries and Daniel Clarke
Case Number: 1:2020cv04860
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 ELECTRONIC Acknowledgement of case transferred to the CENTRAL DISTRICT OF ILLINOIS as case 3:20-cv-03222, filed 08/26/2020. (nsf, )
August 26, 2020 Filing 6 TRANSFERRED to the Central District of Illinois the electronic record. (aee, ) Modified on 8/26/2020 (aee, ).
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER written by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 8/24/2020: For the reasons set forth below, this case is transferred to the Central District of Illinois. The Clerk is directed to transfer this case forthwith. The Clerk is directed to terminate this case and all motions on this docket. Civil case transferred.Mailed notice.(jlj, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Eric Robert Dughetti for attorney representation. (aee, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Eric Robert Dughetti for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (aee, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet. (aee, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by Eric Robert Dughetti. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Envelope postmarked 8/14/20) (aee, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dughetti v. I.D.O.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Robert Dughetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I.D.O.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rob Jeffries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?