Marhaba Wholesale LLC v. Ohio Security Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Marhaba Wholesale LLC
Defendant: Ohio Security Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv04864
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John F Kness
Referring Judge: Franklin U Valderrama
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama: Attorney Katie C. Pfeifer's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #13 is granted. Mailed notice (cn).
October 13, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17534606. (Pfeifer, Katie)
October 2, 2020 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John F. Kness: In light of the reassignment of this case to Judge Valderrama, all hearings set before this Court are stricken. Mailed notice (ef, )
September 28, 2020 Filing 11 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: GENERAL ORDER 20-0027: Pursuant that to the Executive Committee Order entered on September 23, 2020 the civil cases on the attached list have been selected for reassignment to form the initial calendar of the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama; therefore IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the attached list of 371 cases be reassigned to the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all parties affected by this Order must review the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama's webpage on the Court's website for the purpose of reviewing instructions regarding scheduling and case management procedures; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any civil case that has been reassigned pursuant to this Order will not be randomly reassigned to create the initial calendar of a new district judge for twelve months from the date of this Order; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to add the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama to the Court's civil case assignment system during the next business day, so that he shall receive a full share of such cases. Case reassigned to the Honorable Franklin U. Valderrama for all further proceedings. Honorable John F. Kness no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 9/28/2020.(Clerk6, Docket)
September 23, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Ohio Security Insurance Company by Kenneth Clark Schirle (Schirle, Kenneth)
September 23, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Ohio Security Insurance Company(Barger, Jonathan)
September 23, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Ohio Security Insurance Company by Jonathan Kevin Barger (Barger, Jonathan)
August 27, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Ohio Security Insurance Company. (ng, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Marhaba Wholesale LLC (Andalman, Robert)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Marhaba Wholesale LLC by Kristin T. Opal (Opal, Kristin)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Marhaba Wholesale LLC by Rachael Cecelia Brennan Blackburn (Blackburn, Rachael)
August 19, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John F. Kness. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cp, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Marhaba Wholesale LLC by Robert M. Andalman (Andalman, Robert)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Andalman, Robert)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Marhaba Wholesale LLC; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17343442.(Andalman, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marhaba Wholesale LLC v. Ohio Security Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Security Insurance Company
Represented By: Jonathan Kevin Barger
Represented By: Kenneth Clark Schirle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marhaba Wholesale LLC
Represented By: Robert M. Andalman
Represented By: Kristin T. Opal
Represented By: Rachael Cecelia Brennan Blackburn
Represented By: Katie C Pfeifer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?