Kioba Processing LLC v. Discover Financial Services et al
Plaintiff: Kioba Processing LLC
Defendant: Discover Financial Services, DFS Services LLC and Discover Bank
Case Number: 1:2020cv04868
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2020 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Unopposed motion for extension of time #14 is granted; response to complaint is to be filed by 10/21/2020. By no later than 10/26/2020, the parties are to file a joint status report that includes the following information: (1) the status of service of process upon each defendant; (2) a description of each party's claims and defenses; (3) details regarding any discussions concerning settlement, whether before or after the filing of the lawsuit; (4) a proposed discovery and pretrial schedule; and (5) any other matters that any party wishes to bring to the Court's attention. The case is set for a case management conference under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16 (a "status hearing," in local parlance) on 11/2/2020 at 8:45 a.m. The case management conference will be conducted by telephone, using the following call-in number: 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. Counsel should wait for the case to be called before announcing themselves. (mk)
September 18, 2020 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants DFS Services LLC, Discover Bank, Discover Financial Services by David Spencer Bloch (Bloch, David)
September 18, 2020 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants DFS Services LLC, Discover Bank, Discover Financial Services by Kelyn J Smith (Smith, Kelyn)
September 18, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION by Defendants DFS Services LLC, Discover Bank, Discover Financial Services for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint, #1 [Unopposed] (Flynn, Kyle)
September 18, 2020 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants DFS Services LLC, Discover Bank, Discover Financial Services by Kyle L Flynn (Flynn, Kyle)
September 8, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kioba Processing LLC as to Discover Bank on 8/31/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (Rastegar, Jonathan)
September 3, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kioba Processing LLC as to DFS Services LLC on 8/31/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (Rastegar, Jonathan)
September 3, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kioba Processing LLC as to Discover Financial Services on 8/31/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (Rastegar, Jonathan)
September 3, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion of Ryan Griffin to appear pro hac vice #8 is granted. (mk)
September 2, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17387336. (Griffin, Ryan)
August 28, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly:Motions of Jonathan Rastegar and Thomas Kennelly to appear pro hac vice #5 #6 are granted. (mk)
August 27, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17368606. (Kennedy, Thomas)
August 27, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17368540. (Rastegar, Jonathan)
August 21, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants DFS Services LLC, Discover Bank, and Discover Financial Services. (acm, )
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 MAILED Patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (nsf, )
August 20, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cp, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kioba Processing LLC by Neil A Benchell (Benchell, Neil)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Kioba Processing LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17344525. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Benchell, Neil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kioba Processing LLC v. Discover Financial Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kioba Processing LLC
Represented By: Neil A Benchell
Represented By: Thomas William Kennedy, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathan Hart Rastegar
Represented By: Ryan Paul Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discover Financial Services
Represented By: Kyle L Flynn
Represented By: Kelyn J Smith
Represented By: David Spencer Bloch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DFS Services LLC
Represented By: Kyle L Flynn
Represented By: Kelyn J Smith
Represented By: David Spencer Bloch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discover Bank
Represented By: Kyle L Flynn
Represented By: Kelyn J Smith
Represented By: David Spencer Bloch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?