Bell v. TravelClick, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Alicia Bel and Alicia Bell
Defendant: TravelClick, Inc., Kimberly Fish and Suzette Schilling
Case Number: 1:2020cv04905
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Durkin
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Alicia Bell by Barbara J Bell (Bell, Barbara)
September 18, 2020 Filing 10 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by TravelClick, Inc. DEFENDANT TRAVELCLICK, INC.'S CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND NOTIFICATION AS TO AFFILIATES (Moran, Kathryn)
September 11, 2020 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Motion for extension of time to answer #4 is granted. Defendant has until 10/26/2020 to answer or otherwise plead in response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
August 27, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: A joint status report is to be filed by 10/29/2020. Instructions may be found on Judge Durkin's webpage under new and reassigned cases. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record (sxb, )
August 21, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (gw, )
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant TravelClick, Inc. by Anderson Charles Franklin APPEARANCE (Franklin, Anderson)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION by Defendant TravelClick, Inc. for extension of time to file answer DEFENDANTS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR AN ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD (Moran, Kathryn)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant TravelClick, Inc. by Kathryn Montgomery Moran APPEARANCE (Moran, Kathryn)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Moran, Kathryn)
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2020-L-007524) filed by TravelClick, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17347974. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Summons)(Moran, Kathryn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell v. TravelClick, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Bel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Bell
Represented By: Barbara J Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TravelClick, Inc.
Represented By: Kathryn Montgomery Moran
Represented By: Anderson Charles Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Fish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzette Schilling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?