Karns v. Deloitte Consulting LLP
Plaintiff: Krystal Karns
Defendant: Deloitte Consulting LLP
Case Number: 1:2020cv04952
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Robert Blakey
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant's motion to transfer #18 by 10/30/20, and Defendant shall file any reply by 11/6/20. Mailed notice (gel, )
October 8, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION by Defendant Deloitte Consulting LLP to transfer case (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Culbertson First Consolidated Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Scott Malm)(Sumner, Phyllis)
September 23, 2020 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Joint motion for extension of time to file joint status report #16 is granted and joint status report shall be filed on or before 12/2/2020. Mailed notice (gel, )
September 18, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION by Defendant Deloitte Consulting LLP for extension of time to File Joint Status Report (Sumner, Phyllis)
September 17, 2020 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Defendant's motion for extension of time to file answer #12 is granted and any answer shall be filed on or before 11/2/2020. Mailed notice (gel, )
September 16, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE Deloitte Consulting LLP Corporate Disclosure Statement (Sumner, Phyllis)
September 16, 2020 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Deloitte Consulting LLP by Alvin Young Lee (Lee, Alvin)
September 16, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION by Defendant Deloitte Consulting LLP for extension of time to file answer (Sumner, Phyllis)
September 16, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Deloitte Consulting LLP by Phyllis B. Sumner (Sumner, Phyllis)
September 3, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by Steven Gene Perry of Change of Address (Perry, Steven)
September 3, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by David B. Levin of Change of Address (Levin, David)
August 31, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Krystal Karns as to Deloitte Consulting LLP on 8/27/2020, answer due 9/17/2020. (Levin, David)
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. The litigants are ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Court's standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Court's official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. In addition, the parties must file a status report no later than 9/25/2020, using the model template set forth in this Court's standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. Failure by any party to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary, individually with an explanation as to why a joint report could not be filed) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute, or an entry of default against any served defendant(s) failing to comply with this order. During the litigation, the attorneys must also appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at (312)818-6699. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. Mailed notice (gel, )
August 25, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Deloitte Consulting LLP (mp, )
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Krystal Karns by Seyed Abbas Kazerounian (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kazerounian, Seyed)
August 24, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (dxb, )
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Krystal Karns by Steven Gene Perry (Perry, Steven)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Krystal Karns by David B. Levin (Levin, David)
August 24, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Krystal Karns by Todd M Friedman (Friedman, Todd)
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Krystal Karns; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17354226. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appearance)(Levin, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Karns v. Deloitte Consulting LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deloitte Consulting LLP
Represented By: Phyllis B. Sumner
Represented By: Alvin Young Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krystal Karns
Represented By: Seyed Abbas Kazerounian
Represented By: David B. Levin
Represented By: Steven Gene Perry
Represented By: Todd M Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?