South Branch LLC et al v. Commonwealth Edison Company et al
Plaintiff: TFO Golub Burnham LLC, d/b/a The Burnham Center, Rockwell on the River LLC, South Branch LLC, TFO Golub IT 2.0 LLC, d/b/a International Tower, TFO Golub Burnham LLC doing business as The Burnham Center and TFO Golub IT 2.0 LLC doing business as International Tower
Defendant: Exelon Corporation, Commonwealth Edison Company d/b/a ComEd and Commonwealth Edison Company doing business as ComEd
Case Number: 1:2020cv04980
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jorge L Alonso
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2020 Filing 14 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso for all further proceedings. Honorable Martha M. Pacold no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/20/2020. (lma, )
October 19, 2020 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold:The status report filing date of 11/16/2020 is stricken. (rao, )
October 13, 2020 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report by 11/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Initial Status Report outline) (rao, )
September 2, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by South Branch LLC, Rockwell on the River LLC, TFO Golub IT 2.0 LLC, TFO Golub Burnham LLC. Exelon Corporation waiver sent on 8/31/2020, answer due 10/30/2020. (Brown, Emily)
September 2, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by South Branch LLC, Rockwell on the River LLC, TFO Golub IT 2.0 LLC, TFO Golub Burnham LLC. Commonwealth Edison Company waiver sent on 8/31/2020, answer due 10/30/2020. (Brown, Emily)
August 31, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Commonwealth Edison Company, Exelon Corporation (exr, )
August 31, 2020 Filing 9 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold for all further proceedings. Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/31/2020. (lma, )
August 28, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (dxb, )
August 24, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Rockwell on the River LLC, South Branch LLC, TFO Golub Burnham LLC, d/b/a The Burnham Center, TFO Golub IT 2.0 LLC, d/b/a International Tower by Mark S. Dym (Dym, Mark)
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Rockwell on the River LLC, South Branch LLC, TFO Golub Burnham LLC, d/b/a The Burnham Center, TFO Golub IT 2.0 LLC, d/b/a International Tower by Chirag Gopal Badlani (Badlani, Chirag)
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Rockwell on the River LLC, South Branch LLC, TFO Golub Burnham LLC, d/b/a The Burnham Center, TFO Golub IT 2.0 LLC, d/b/a International Tower by Emily Rees Brown (Brown, Emily)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Rockwell on the River LLC, South Branch LLC, TFO Golub Burnham LLC, d/b/a The Burnham Center, TFO Golub IT 2.0 LLC, d/b/a International Tower by Charles David Wysong (Wysong, Charles)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Rockwell on the River LLC, South Branch LLC, TFO Golub Burnham LLC, d/b/a The Burnham Center, TFO Golub IT 2.0 LLC, d/b/a International Tower by Matthew J. Piers (Piers, Matthew)
August 24, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Piers, Matthew)
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by South Branch LLC, Rockwell on the River LLC, TFO Golub IT 2.0 LLC, d/b/a International Tower, TFO Golub Burnham LLC, d/b/a The Burnham Center; JURY DEMAND. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17357075. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Piers, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: South Branch LLC et al v. Commonwealth Edison Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TFO Golub Burnham LLC, d/b/a The Burnham Center
Represented By: Charles David Wysong
Represented By: Matthew J. Piers
Represented By: Mark S. Dym
Represented By: Chirag Gopal Badlani
Represented By: Emily Rees Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rockwell on the River LLC
Represented By: Charles David Wysong
Represented By: Matthew J. Piers
Represented By: Mark S. Dym
Represented By: Chirag Gopal Badlani
Represented By: Emily Rees Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Branch LLC
Represented By: Charles David Wysong
Represented By: Matthew J. Piers
Represented By: Mark S. Dym
Represented By: Chirag Gopal Badlani
Represented By: Emily Rees Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TFO Golub IT 2.0 LLC, d/b/a International Tower
Represented By: Charles David Wysong
Represented By: Matthew J. Piers
Represented By: Mark S. Dym
Represented By: Chirag Gopal Badlani
Represented By: Emily Rees Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TFO Golub Burnham LLC doing business as The Burnham Center
Represented By: Charles David Wysong
Represented By: Matthew J. Piers
Represented By: Mark S. Dym
Represented By: Chirag Gopal Badlani
Represented By: Emily Rees Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TFO Golub IT 2.0 LLC doing business as International Tower
Represented By: Charles David Wysong
Represented By: Matthew J. Piers
Represented By: Mark S. Dym
Represented By: Chirag Gopal Badlani
Represented By: Emily Rees Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exelon Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth Edison Company d/b/a ComEd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth Edison Company doing business as ComEd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?