Dornan v. Interstate Chemical Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Dawn Dornan
Defendant: Interstate Chemical Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv05014
Filed: August 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Andrea R Wood
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #8 is granted. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by 11/23/2020. The telephonic status hearing set for 10/29/2020 remains firm. Mailed notice (dal, )
October 22, 2020 Filing 9 STATUS Report Joint Status Report by Dawn Dornan (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Han, Jason)
October 21, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION by Defendant Interstate Chemical Company, Inc. for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead (Brohman, Michael)
October 16, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Interstate Chemical Company, Inc. by Michael B. Brohman (Brohman, Michael)
September 4, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Dawn Dornan. Interstate Chemical Company, Inc served on 8/28/2020, answer due 10/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing, #2 Certificate of Service)(Han, Jason) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 9/8/2020) (pj, ).
August 27, 2020 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Telephonic initial status hearing set for 10/29/2020 at 9:00 AM. To ensure public access to court proceedings, members of the public and media may call in to listen to telephonic hearings. The call-in number is (888) 557-8511 and the access code is 3547847. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. Mailed notice (dal, )
August 26, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (dxb, )
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Dawn Dornan by Jason C Han (Han, Jason)
August 25, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed by Dawn Dornan; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17362477.(Han, Jason)
August 25, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Han, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dornan v. Interstate Chemical Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interstate Chemical Company, Inc.
Represented By: Michael B. Brohman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Dornan
Represented By: Jason C Han
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?