Niedelson v. Deloitte Consulting, LLP
Plaintiff: Mark Niedelson
Defendant: Deloitte Consulting, LLP
Case Number: 1:2020cv05054
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Rebecca R Pallmeyer
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Pursuant to Plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal, this case is dismissed without prejudice. Civil case terminated. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
September 16, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Mark Niedelson (Lesser, Bryan)
September 3, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Niedelson as to Deloitte Consulting, LLP on 9/2/2020, answer due 9/23/2020. (Goodwin, Tara)
August 28, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Deloitte Consulting, LLP. (ng, )
August 28, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Parties are directed to file a joint written status report by 10/30/2020. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
August 27, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (dxb, )
August 27, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mark Niedelson by Bryan G. Lesser (Lesser, Bryan)
August 27, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mark Niedelson by Cathleen M. Combs (Combs, Cathleen)
August 27, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mark Niedelson by Daniel A. Edelman (Edelman, Daniel)
August 27, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Edelman, Daniel)
August 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Mark Niedelson; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17369493.(Edelman, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Niedelson v. Deloitte Consulting, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deloitte Consulting, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Niedelson
Represented By: Daniel A. Edelman
Represented By: Bryan G. Lesser
Represented By: Cathleen M. Combs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?