Crawford et al v. McDonald's USA, LLC. et al
Plaintiff: Jacqueline George, Ronnie Thornton, Carrie Salone, Victor Bruce, Hayes Ferrell, Annis Alston-Staley, Kent Jones, Jeremy Lewis, Errol Service, John Mason, Joseph Mbanefo, Yvonne Knox, Van Jakes, Jeffery Rogers, David White, Allen Stafford, Dwayne Richard Johnson, Laetitia Johnson, Juneth N Daniel, Dawn Mussenden, Joketra Hall, George Gipson, Karen Tancrede, Floyd Sims, Kurt Holloway, Jeremiah Simmons, Kenneth Manning, William Rasul, Yves Dominique, Errol Thybulle, Keith Manning, LeRoy Walker, Jr., Lawrence Holland, Ralph King, Philip Douglas, Harry Staley, Mitchell McGuire, Michael Simon, Lisa Gunter, Serge Tancrede, Gordon Thornton, John Tillman, Larry Brown, Harold Lewis, Wise Finley, Christine Crawford, Darryl Umphries, Arthur Scott, Melvin Jones, Lois McGuire, Delores Crawford and Lewis Anderson
Defendant: McDonald's Corporation and McDonald's USA, LLC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv05132
Filed: August 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Steven C Seeger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Filing 26 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: The Court sets the following briefing schedule for Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (Dckt. No. #24 ) Plaintiffs shall file a response by November 20, 2020. Defendants shall file a reply by December 4, 2020. No appearance on the motion is necessary. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
October 23, 2020 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM by McDonald's Corporation, McDonald's USA, LLC. in support of motion to dismiss #24 (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3(a)-(k))(Holmes, Patricia)
October 23, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION by Defendants McDonald's USA, LLC., McDonald's Corporation to dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(B)(6) (Holmes, Patricia)
September 18, 2020 Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (Dckt. No. #22 ) is hereby granted. As agreed, the Court extends the deadline for Defendants to respond to the complaint to October 23, 2020. Plaintiffs' response is due by November 23, and the reply is due by December 7. The Court also grants the request for additional pages. The page limit for Defendants' opening brief, and Plaintiffs' response brief, is 35 pages. The page limit for the reply brief is 15 pages. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
September 17, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION by Defendants McDonald's Corporation, McDonald's USA, LLC. for extension of time and proposed order regarding briefing schedule and page limits for defendant's Rule 12(B) Motion (Holmes, Patricia)
September 14, 2020 Filing 21 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants McDonald's Corporation, McDonald's USA, LLC. by Karen King (King, Karen)
September 14, 2020 Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants McDonald's Corporation, McDonald's USA, LLC. by Andrew Jason Wu (Wu, Andrew)
September 14, 2020 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: The Court grants both motions for leave to appear pro hac vice (Dckt. Nos. #17 and #18 ) Attorney Andrew Jason Wu and Karen King are added as counsel for McDonald's Corporation and McDonald's USA, LLC. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
September 11, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17428615. (King, Karen)
September 11, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17428589. (Wu, Andrew)
September 11, 2020 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants McDonald's Corporation, McDonald's USA, LLC. by Raymond Dion Rushing (Rushing, Raymond)
September 10, 2020 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants McDonald's Corporation, McDonald's USA, LLC. by Susanna M. Buergel (Buergel, Susanna)
September 10, 2020 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants McDonald's Corporation, McDonald's USA, LLC. by Loretta E. Lynch (Lynch, Loretta)
September 10, 2020 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: The Court grants both motions to appear pro hac vice. (Dckt. No. #11 and #12 ) Attorney Susanna M. Buergel and Loretta E. Lynch are added as counsel for Defendants. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
September 10, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17416410. (Buergel, Susanna)
September 10, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-17416335. (Lynch, Loretta)
September 10, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants McDonald's Corporation, McDonald's USA, LLC. by Amy Curtner Andrews (Andrews, Amy)
September 10, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants McDonald's Corporation, McDonald's USA, LLC. by Patricia Brown Holmes (Holmes, Patricia)
September 2, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants McDonald's Corporation, McDonald's USA, LLC. (jg, )
September 1, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Steven C. Seeger: An initial status report is due by November 19, 2020. Counsel must read the Standing Order entitled "Initial Status Conferences and Joint Initial Status Reports" on the Court's website. The parties must discuss settlement in good faith and make a serious attempt to resolve this case amicably. The parties also must confer as required by Rule 26(f) about the nature, scope, and duration of discovery. The parties must submit two documents to the Court. First, the parties must file the Joint Initial Status Report under Rule 26(f) on the docket. A Word version of the Joint Initial Status Report is available on the Court's website. Second, the parties must submit a Word version of a proposed Scheduling Order under Rule 16(b) to the Court's proposed order inbox. Lead counsel for the parties must participate in filing the initial status report. Plaintiff must serve this Order on all other parties. If the defendant has not been served with process, plaintiff's counsel must contact the Courtroom Deputy at jessica_j_ramos@ilnd.uscourts.gov to reschedule the initial status report deadline. Plaintiff should not file the Joint Initial Status Report before the defendant(s) has been served with process. All counsel of record must read and comply with this Court's Standing Orders on its webpage. Please pay special attention to the Standing Orders about Depositions and Discovery. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
September 1, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Steven C. Seeger. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cp, )
September 1, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Annis Alston-Staley, Lewis Anderson, Larry Brown, Victor Bruce, Christine Crawford, Delores Crawford, Juneth N Daniel, Yves Dominique, Philip Douglas, Hayes Ferrell, Wise Finley, Jacqueline George, George Gipson, Lisa Gunter, Joketra Hall, Lawrence Holland, Kurt Holloway, Van Jakes, Dwayne Richard Johnson, Laetitia Johnson, Kent Jones, Melvin Jones, Ralph King, Yvonne Knox, Harold Lewis, Jeremy Lewis, Keith Manning, Kenneth Manning, John Mason, Joseph Mbanefo, Lois McGuire, Mitchell McGuire, Dawn Mussenden, William Rasul, Jeffery Rogers, Carrie Salone, Arthur Scott, Errol Service, Jeremiah Simmons, Michael Simon, Floyd Sims, Allen Stafford, Harry Staley, Karen Tancrede, Serge Tancrede, Gordon Thornton, Ronnie Thornton, Errol Thybulle, John Tillman, Darryl Umphries, LeRoy Walker, Jr., David White by Natalia Maria Salas (Salas, Natalia)
September 1, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Annis Alston-Staley, Lewis Anderson, Larry Brown, Victor Bruce, Christine Crawford, Delores Crawford, Juneth N Daniel, Yves Dominique, Philip Douglas, Hayes Ferrell, Wise Finley, Jacqueline George, George Gipson, Lisa Gunter, Joketra Hall, Lawrence Holland, Kurt Holloway, Van Jakes, Dwayne Richard Johnson, Laetitia Johnson, Kent Jones, Melvin Jones, Ralph King, Yvonne Knox, Harold Lewis, Jeremy Lewis, Keith Manning, Kenneth Manning, John Mason, Joseph Mbanefo, Lois McGuire, Mitchell McGuire, Dawn Mussenden, William Rasul, Jeffery Rogers, Carrie Salone, Arthur Scott, Errol Service, Jeremiah Simmons, Michael Simon, Floyd Sims, Allen Stafford, Harry Staley, Karen Tancrede, Serge Tancrede, Gordon Thornton, Ronnie Thornton, Errol Thybulle, John Tillman, Darryl Umphries, LeRoy Walker, Jr., David White by Mamie Coleen Joeveer (Joeveer, Mamie)
September 1, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Annis Alston-Staley, Lewis Anderson, Larry Brown, Victor Bruce, Christine Crawford, Delores Crawford, Juneth N Daniel, Yves Dominique, Philip Douglas, Hayes Ferrell, Wise Finley, Jacqueline George, George Gipson, Lisa Gunter, Joketra Hall, Lawrence Holland, Kurt Holloway, Van Jakes, Dwayne Richard Johnson, Laetitia Johnson, Kent Jones, Melvin Jones, Ralph King, Yvonne Knox, Harold Lewis, Jeremy Lewis, Keith Manning, Kenneth Manning, John Mason, Joseph Mbanefo, Lois McGuire, Mitchell McGuire, Dawn Mussenden, William Rasul, Jeffery Rogers, Carrie Salone, Arthur Scott, Errol Service, Jeremiah Simmons, Michael Simon, Floyd Sims, Allen Stafford, Harry Staley, Karen Tancrede, Serge Tancrede, Gordon Thornton, Ronnie Thornton, Errol Thybulle, John Tillman, Darryl Umphries, LeRoy Walker, Jr., David White by Janpaul Portal (Portal, Janpaul)
August 31, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Annis Alston-Staley, Lewis Anderson, Larry Brown, Victor Bruce, Christine Crawford, Delores Crawford, Juneth N Daniel, Yves Dominique, Philip Douglas, Hayes Ferrell, Wise Finley, Jacqueline George, George Gipson, Lisa Gunter, Joketra Hall, Lawrence Holland, Kurt Holloway, Van Jakes, Dwayne Richard Johnson, Laetitia Johnson, Kent Jones, Melvin Jones, Ralph King, Yvonne Knox, Harold Lewis, Jeremy Lewis, Keith Manning, Kenneth Manning, John Mason, Joseph Mbanefo, Lois McGuire, Mitchell McGuire, Dawn Mussenden, William Rasul, Jeffery Rogers, Carrie Salone, Arthur Scott, Errol Service, Jeremiah Simmons, Michael Simon, Floyd Sims, Allen Stafford, Harry Staley, Karen Tancrede, Serge Tancrede, Gordon Thornton, Ronnie Thornton, Errol Thybulle, John Tillman, Darryl Umphries, LeRoy Walker, Jr., David White by James L. Ferraro (Ferraro, James)
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Ferraro, James)
August 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Jeremy Lewis, Harold Lewis, Arthur Scott, Keith Manning, Victor Bruce, Mitchell McGuire, Delores Crawford, Christine Crawford, Lois McGuire, Kurt Holloway, Lisa Gunter, Serge Tancrede, David White, Michael Simon, John Tillman, Annis Alston-Staley, John Mason, Yvonne Knox, Darryl Umphries, George Gipson, Laetitia Johnson, Kent Jones, Lawrence Holland, Carrie Salone, Jeremiah Simmons, Gordon Thornton, Errol Service, Errol Thybulle, Larry Brown, Melvin Jones, Allen Stafford, Ralph King, Jacqueline George, Joseph Mbanefo, William Rasul, Juneth N Daniel, Dawn Mussenden, Joketra Hall, Harry Staley, Floyd Sims, Ronnie Thornton, Wise Finley, Jeffery Rogers, Lewis Anderson, Kenneth Manning, Yves Dominique, Philip Douglas, LeRoy Walker, Jr., Karen Tancrede, Hayes Ferrell, Dwayne Richard Johnson, Van Jakes; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17381347. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Ferraro, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crawford et al v. McDonald's USA, LLC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline George
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: Mamie Coleen Joeveer
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: Janpaul Portal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Thornton
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: Mamie Coleen Joeveer
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: Janpaul Portal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carrie Salone
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: Mamie Coleen Joeveer
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: Janpaul Portal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Bruce
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: Mamie Coleen Joeveer
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: Janpaul Portal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hayes Ferrell
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: Mamie Coleen Joeveer
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: Janpaul Portal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annis Alston-Staley
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: Mamie Coleen Joeveer
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: Janpaul Portal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kent Jones
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: Mamie Coleen Joeveer
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: Janpaul Portal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Lewis
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: Mamie Coleen Joeveer
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: Janpaul Portal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Errol Service
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: Mamie Coleen Joeveer
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: Janpaul Portal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Mason
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: Mamie Coleen Joeveer
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: Janpaul Portal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Mbanefo
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: Mamie Coleen Joeveer
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: Janpaul Portal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvonne Knox
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: Mamie Coleen Joeveer
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: Janpaul Portal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Van Jakes
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: Mamie Coleen Joeveer
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: Janpaul Portal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery Rogers
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: Mamie Coleen Joeveer
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: Janpaul Portal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David White
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: Mamie Coleen Joeveer
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: Janpaul Portal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Stafford
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: Mamie Coleen Joeveer
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: Janpaul Portal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwayne Richard Johnson
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: Mamie Coleen Joeveer
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: Janpaul Portal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laetitia Johnson
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: Mamie Coleen Joeveer
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: Janpaul Portal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juneth N Daniel
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: Mamie Coleen Joeveer
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: Janpaul Portal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Mussenden
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: Mamie Coleen Joeveer
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: Janpaul Portal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joketra Hall
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: Mamie Coleen Joeveer
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: Janpaul Portal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Gipson
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: Mamie Coleen Joeveer
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: Janpaul Portal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Tancrede
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: Mamie Coleen Joeveer
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: Janpaul Portal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Floyd Sims
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: Mamie Coleen Joeveer
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: Janpaul Portal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kurt Holloway
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: Mamie Coleen Joeveer
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: Janpaul Portal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremiah Simmons
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: Mamie Coleen Joeveer
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: Janpaul Portal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Manning
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: Mamie Coleen Joeveer
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: Janpaul Portal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Rasul
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: Mamie Coleen Joeveer
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: Janpaul Portal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yves Dominique
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: Mamie Coleen Joeveer
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: Janpaul Portal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Errol Thybulle
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: Mamie Coleen Joeveer
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: Janpaul Portal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Manning
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: Mamie Coleen Joeveer
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: Janpaul Portal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LeRoy Walker, Jr.
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: Mamie Coleen Joeveer
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: Janpaul Portal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Holland
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: Mamie Coleen Joeveer
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: Janpaul Portal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph King
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: Mamie Coleen Joeveer
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: Janpaul Portal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Douglas
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: Mamie Coleen Joeveer
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: Janpaul Portal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Staley
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: Mamie Coleen Joeveer
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: Janpaul Portal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitchell McGuire
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: Mamie Coleen Joeveer
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: Janpaul Portal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Simon
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: Mamie Coleen Joeveer
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: Janpaul Portal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Gunter
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: Mamie Coleen Joeveer
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: Janpaul Portal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Serge Tancrede
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: Mamie Coleen Joeveer
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: Janpaul Portal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gordon Thornton
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: Mamie Coleen Joeveer
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: Janpaul Portal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Tillman
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: Mamie Coleen Joeveer
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: Janpaul Portal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Brown
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: Mamie Coleen Joeveer
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: Janpaul Portal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Lewis
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: Mamie Coleen Joeveer
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: Janpaul Portal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wise Finley
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: Mamie Coleen Joeveer
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: Janpaul Portal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Crawford
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: Mamie Coleen Joeveer
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: Janpaul Portal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl Umphries
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: Mamie Coleen Joeveer
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: Janpaul Portal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Scott
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: Mamie Coleen Joeveer
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: Janpaul Portal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Jones
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: Mamie Coleen Joeveer
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: Janpaul Portal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lois McGuire
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: Mamie Coleen Joeveer
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: Janpaul Portal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delores Crawford
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: Mamie Coleen Joeveer
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: Janpaul Portal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lewis Anderson
Represented By: Natalia Maria Salas
Represented By: Mamie Coleen Joeveer
Represented By: James L. Ferraro
Represented By: Janpaul Portal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McDonald's Corporation
Represented By: Andrew Jason Wu
Represented By: Karen King
Represented By: Raymond Dion Rushing
Represented By: Amy Curtner Andrews
Represented By: Susanna M. Buergel
Represented By: Patricia Brown Holmes
Represented By: Loretta E. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McDonald's USA, LLC.
Represented By: Andrew Jason Wu
Represented By: Karen King
Represented By: Raymond Dion Rushing
Represented By: Amy Curtner Andrews
Represented By: Susanna M. Buergel
Represented By: Patricia Brown Holmes
Represented By: Loretta E. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?