Wayne Farms LLC v John Doe et al
Plaintiff: Wayne Farms LLC
Defendant: John Doe, Frank L. Annese, Gracie Henderson and LinkedIn Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv05191
Filed: September 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Referring Judge: Gary _Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1127 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2021 Filing 46 ENTERED JUDGMENT on 1/6/2021.Mailed notice.(jlj, )
January 6, 2021 Filing 45 ENTERED JUDGMENT Signed by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 1/6/2021.Mailed notice.(jlj, )
January 6, 2021 Filing 44 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion hearing held. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiff's motion for default judgment #39 is granted. Enter judgment and permanent injunction order. Enter judgment order. Civil case closed.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
January 6, 2021 Filing 43 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Wayne Farms LLC to temporary restraining order #14 Filing Copy of Response of Truist fka BB&T to TRO (Brezina, David)
January 6, 2021 Filing 42 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Wayne Farms LLC to temporary restraining order #14 Filing Copy of Response of Wells Fargo to TRO (Brezina, David)
December 30, 2020 Filing 41 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Hearing on motion for default judgment #39 set for 1/6/2021 at 9:15 a.m. If Doe Defendant wishes to oppose the motion, Doe Defendant should file a written opposition by 1/5/2021 or appear at the 1/6/2021 hearing; otherwise, the court will rule on the motion at the 1/6/2021 hearing. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Plaintiffs shall electronically serve Doe Defendant with a copy of this order.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
December 28, 2020 Filing 40 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Given the notice of voluntary dismissal #38 , the Clerk is directed to terminate LinkedIn as a party defendant.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
December 23, 2020 Filing 39 MOTION by Plaintiff Wayne Farms LLC for default judgment as to JOHN DOE (Brezina, David)
December 23, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Wayne Farms LLC of LinkedIn (only) without prejudice (Brezina, David)
December 17, 2020 Filing 37 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Status hearing held. Motion hearing held and continued to 1/6/2021 at 9:15 a.m. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiff's motions for default judgment against John Doe #32 #33 are granted. Enter Rule 55(a) default against Defendant John Doe. Plaintiff shall file its Rule 55(b) motion for default judgment by 12/24/2020. If Doe Defendant wishes to oppose Plaintiff's Rule 55(b) motion, Doe Defendant should file a written opposition by 1/14/2021 or appear at the 1/6/2021 hearing; otherwise, the court will rule on the Rule 55(b) motion on the papers at the 1/6/2021 hearing. Plaintiffs shall serve Defendants with this order and their Rule 55(b) papers. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the 1/6/2021 hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
December 16, 2020 Filing 36 STATUS Report Prior to Motion Hearing by Wayne Farms LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibits 26 and 27, #2 Exhibit 26, #3 Exhibit 27)(Brezina, David)
December 13, 2020 Filing 35 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Hearing on motions for default judgment #32 #33 set 12/17/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Plaintiff shall file on the docket the executed return(s) of service or any other documents pertaining to service on Defendants. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
December 10, 2020 Filing 34 STATUS Report by Wayne Farms LLC (Brezina, David)
December 10, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION by Plaintiff Wayne Farms LLC for default judgment as to JOHN DOE (WITH ADDITIONAL EXHIBITS) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration with Exhibits 15, 16, 17, 18, 19, 20, 21, 22, 23, 24, 25, #2 Exhibit 15, #3 Exhibit 16, #4 Exhibit 17, #5 Exhibit 18, #6 Exhibit 19, #7 Exhibit 20, #8 Exhibit 21, #9 Exhibit 22, #10 Exhibit 23, #11 Exhibit 24, #12 Exhibit 25)(Brezina, David)
December 10, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION by Plaintiff Wayne Farms LLC for default judgment as to JOHN DOE (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibits 1, 2, 3 and 14, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 14, #6 Affidavit Exhibits 4, 5, 6, 7, 8, 9, 10, 11, 12 and 13, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10 Redacted, #14 Exhibit 11 Redacted, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13)(Brezina, David)
December 1, 2020 Filing 31 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Wayne Farms LLC. LinkedIn Corporation waiver sent on 10/28/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. (Brezina, David)
December 1, 2020 Filing 30 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Because Doe Defendant has until 12/3/2020 to file a responsive pleading, the status hearing set for 12/4/2020 #22 is stricken and re-set for 12/17/2020 at 9:00 a.m. By 12/10/2020, Plaintiff shall file a status report indicating how it intends to prosecute this case. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
November 13, 2020 Filing 29 SERVICE by Publication filed by Plaintiff Wayne Farms LLC., CERTIFICATE of Service by Plaintiff Wayne Farms LLC (Brezina, David)
November 13, 2020 Filing 28 SERVICE by Publication filed by Plaintiff Wayne Farms LLC. (Brezina, David)
November 5, 2020 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendants Gracie Henderson, Frank Annese (dxb, )
November 2, 2020 Filing 27 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Order Signed by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 11/2/2020.Mailed notice.(jlj, )
November 2, 2020 Filing 26 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for order #25 is granted. The Clerk is directed to issue alias summonses as reflected in Dkts. 25-1 and 25-2. Plaintiff may serve summonses and the complaint by electronic means on the emails set forth in the motion. Enter preliminary injunction order. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
October 28, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION by Plaintiff Wayne Farms LLC for order Authorizing Issue of Summons and for Electronic Service of Summons and Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Affidavit Declaration with Exhibits C, D and E, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Brezina, David)
October 26, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs re amended complaint #23 NOTICE TO ALL DEFENDANTS (Brezina, David)
October 26, 2020 Filing 23 AMENDED complaint by Wayne Farms LLC against All Parties (Brezina, David)
October 15, 2020 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion hearing held. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction #19 is granted. Plaintiff shall submit a proposed order to the proposed order email box. Status hearing set for 12/4/2020 at 9:15 a.m. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the 12/4/2020 hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
October 13, 2020 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Hearing on motion for preliminary injunction #19 set for 10/15/2020 at 9:15 a.m. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
October 13, 2020 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Hearing on motion for preliminary injunction #19 set for 10/15/2020 at 9:15 a.m. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice.(jlj, )
October 12, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION by Plaintiff Wayne Farms LLC for preliminary injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Brezina, David)
October 1, 2020 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion hearing held and continued to 10/15/2020 at 9:15 a.m. Plaintiff's motion to extend temporary restraining order #16 is granted. The TRO #14 is extended to 10/15/2020 at 9:30 a.m. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the 10/15/2020 hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Plaintiff shall electronically and expeditiously serve a copy of this order on Defendants. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
September 28, 2020 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion for preliminary injunction or to extend TRO #16 is entered and continued to 10/1/2020 at 9:15 a.m. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Plaintiff shall electronically and expeditiously serve a copy of this order on Defendants. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
September 25, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION by Plaintiff Wayne Farms LLC for preliminary injunction or Extend TRO (Brezina, David)
September 25, 2020 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:The status hearing set for 10/1/2020 at 9:00 a.m. #10 is re-set for 9:15 a.m. TIME CHANGE ONLY. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
September 16, 2020 Filing 14 TEMPORARY Restraining Order Signed by the Honorable Gary Feinerman on 9/16/2020.Mailed notice.(jlj, )
September 16, 2020 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion hearing held. The 10/1/2020 status hearing #10 shall stand. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiff's ex parte motion for temporary restraining order #11 is granted. Enter order. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
September 11, 2020 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Hearing on Plaintiff's motion to seal document #11 set for 9/16/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
September 9, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION by Plaintiff Wayne Farms LLC to seal document order on motion to seal,,,, set/reset hearings,,, #10 Motion, Docket No. 2 Moved to Seal Proposed Motion, SEALED MOTION by Plaintiff Wayne Farms LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration with Exhibits 1, 2, 3 and 14, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Patrick J Gomez, #3 Exhibit Exhibits 4, 5, 6, 7, 8, 9, 10, 11 redacted, 12 redacted, 13)(Brezina, David)
September 6, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:Motion to seal complaint #2 is granted. Plaintiff may file under seal its complaint and exhibits, so long as it files a redacted version of the complaint and exhibits. Status hearing set for 10/1/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, )
September 4, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Wayne Farms LLC by Boris Umansky (Umansky, Boris)
September 3, 2020 Filing 7 MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (gcy, )
September 2, 2020 Filing 6 Form AO120 Report of Filing Regarding Trademark by Wayne Farms LLC (Brezina, David)
September 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by All Plaintiffs re complaint, #1 (Brezina, David)
September 2, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Wayne Farms LLC by David C. Brezina (Brezina, David)
September 2, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Brezina, David)
September 2, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION by Plaintiff Wayne Farms LLC to seal Complaint and Exhibits (Brezina, David)
September 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Wayne Farms LLC; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17389208. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhbit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5)(Brezina, David)
September 2, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (gw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wayne Farms LLC v John Doe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Farms LLC
Represented By: David C. Brezina
Represented By: Boris Umansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank L. Annese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gracie Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LinkedIn Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?