Bey v. Corbat et al
Plaintiff: Muhammad Bey
Defendant: Mark Begor doing business as Chief Executive Officer of Equifax Inc., conjoined with derivatives, successors and assigns, Brian Cassin doing business as Chief Executive Officer of Experian Information Solution Inc., conjoined with derivatives, successors, and assigns and Michael Corbat doing business as Chief Executive Officer of Citigroup Investment Inc. dba Citibank a.k.a. Citicorp Credit Services, Inc. (USA) combined with derivatives and all successors and assigns
Case Number: 1:2020cv05211
Filed: September 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Filing 23 ANSWER by Plaintiff Muhammad Bey to Court's Order dated 10/8/20 (Exhibits). (aee, )
October 9, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Correction #19 (lma, )
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: The Court grants defendants' motion to dismiss [dkt. no. 10] and dismisses plaintiff's claims against defendants Corbat, Begor, and Cassin. Unless plaintiff files, by 10/23/2020, an amended complaint that states viable claims against proper defendants, the Court will enter judgment against plaintiff. Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 10/8/2020. Mailed notice. (mma, )
October 6, 2020 Filing 21 ANSWER and Motion In Opposition and Motion to be heard regarding: Volunteers' Alleged Reply Memorandum Of law In Support Of Defendants' Motions To Dismiss And Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion In Opposition And Motion To Be Heard Filed On 10/2/2020 Docket #18 by Plaintiff Muhammad Bey. (Attachments) (lma, )
October 6, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER and Motion In Opposition and Motion to be heard regarding: Volunteers' Alleged Reply Memorandum Of law In Support Of Defendants' Motions To Dismiss And Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion In Opposition And Motion To Be Heard Filed On 10/2/2020 Docket #18 by Plaintiff Muhammad Bey. (Attachments) (lma, )
October 2, 2020 Filing 18 REPLY by Mark Begor, Brian Cassin, Michael Corbat to MOTION by Defendants Michael Corbat, Brian Cassin to dismiss Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(4), 12(b)(5), 8(a), and 12(b)(6), or in the Alternative, Motion for a More Definite Statement Pursuant to Rule 12(e) #8 , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Mark Begor Joining Co-Defendants' Michael Corbat and Brian Cassin's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(4), 12(b)(5), 8(a) and 12(b)(6) #10 (In Support) (Comstock, Christopher)
September 25, 2020 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Mark Begor by Jasmine Jane Stanzick (Stanzick, Jasmine)
September 24, 2020 Filing 15 EXHIBITS by Plaintiff Muhammad Bey (lma, )
September 24, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION in opposition and Motion to be heard regarding: Defendants Michael Corbat and Brian Cassin's Motion to dismiss pursuant to Rules 12(b)(4), 12(b)(5), 8(a), and 12(b)(6), or in the Alternative, Motion for a More Definite Statement Pursuant to Rule 12(e) by Plaintiff Muhammad Bey. (Exhibits) (lma, )
September 24, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION by Plaintiff Muhammad Bey for summary judgment and MOTION to be heard. (Exhibits) (lma, )
September 23, 2020 Filing 17 REFUND PROCESSED re Request for Clerk of Court to refund filing fee in the amount of $400, receipt no. 0752-17391894 #12 . (lw, )
September 21, 2020 Filing 12 REQUEST for Clerk of Court to refund filing fee in the amount of $400, receipt no. 0752-17391894, regarding notice of removal, #1 Bey v. Corbat et al (Comstock, Christopher)
September 21, 2020 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Plaintiff is directed to file a written response to defendants' motions to dismiss or for a more definite statement by no later than 10/19/2020. Defendants are directed to file a written reply to the response by 11/2/2020. Mailed notice. (mma, )
September 14, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Mark Begor Joining Co-Defendants' Michael Corbat and Brian Cassin's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(4), 12(b)(5), 8(a) and 12(b)(6) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons)(Devata, Pamela)
September 10, 2020 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM by Brian Cassin, Michael Corbat in support of motion to dismiss #8 Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(4), 12(b)(5), 8(a), and 12(b)(6), or in the Alternative, Motion for a More Definite Statement Pursuant to Rule 12(e) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Comstock, Christopher)
September 10, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION by Defendants Michael Corbat, Brian Cassin to dismiss Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(4), 12(b)(5), 8(a), and 12(b)(6), or in the Alternative, Motion for a More Definite Statement Pursuant to Rule 12(e) (Comstock, Christopher)
September 4, 2020 Filing 7 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel. (lma, )
September 3, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Consent to Removal by Brian Cassin (McQueen, Allison)
September 3, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Brian Cassin by Allison Leigh McQueen (McQueen, Allison)
September 3, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (axc, )
September 3, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Michael Corbat by Lucia Nale (Nale, Lucia)
September 3, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Michael Corbat by Christopher Steven Comstock (Comstock, Christopher)
September 3, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Comstock, Christopher)
September 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2020-CH-050509) filed by Michael Corbat Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17392004. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Comstock, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bey v. Corbat et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Begor doing business as Chief Executive Officer of Equifax Inc., conjoined with derivatives, successors and assigns
Represented By: Jasmine Jane Stanzick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Cassin doing business as Chief Executive Officer of Experian Information Solution Inc., conjoined with derivatives, successors, and assigns
Represented By: Allison Leigh McQueen
Represented By: Christopher Steven Comstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Corbat doing business as Chief Executive Officer of Citigroup Investment Inc. dba Citibank a.k.a. Citicorp Credit Services, Inc. (USA) combined with derivatives and all successors and assigns
Represented By: Lucia Nale
Represented By: Christopher Steven Comstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Muhammad Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?