Campbell v. Marshall International, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Brandi Campbell
Defendant: Marshall International, LLC, Marshall International, LLC doing business as Gold Club Chicago also known as The Gold Room, Pera M. Odishoo and The Gold Room
Case Number: 1:2020cv05321
Filed: September 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice (Manewith, Bradley)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Marshall International, LLC, Pera M. Odishoo by Oscar Stephane Kpota (Kpota, Oscar)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Marshall International, LLC, Pera M. Odishoo by Luke A. Casson (Casson, Luke)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Scheduling Conference set for 12/10/2020 at 09:45 AM (for tracking purposes only; no appearance will be required). Joint Rule 26(f) planning report due 12/4/2020. The court will enter a schedule based on the report. Mailed notice (reg)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Marshall International, LLC, Pera M. Odishoo (dxb, )
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kl, )
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Brandi Campbell by James D Rogers (Rogers, James)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Brandi Campbell by Marc J. Siegel (Siegel, Marc)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Brandi Campbell by Bradley S Manewith (Manewith, Bradley)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Brandi Campbell; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17412680. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Manewith, Bradley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell v. Marshall International, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandi Campbell
Represented By: James D Rogers
Represented By: Bradley S Manewith
Represented By: Marc J. Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall International, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall International, LLC doing business as Gold Club Chicago also known as The Gold Room
Represented By: Oscar Stephane Kpota
Represented By: Luke A. Casson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pera M. Odishoo
Represented By: Oscar Stephane Kpota
Represented By: Luke A. Casson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Gold Room
Represented By: Oscar Stephane Kpota
Represented By: Luke A. Casson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?