Mott v. Guaranteed Rate, Inc.
Plaintiff: Rebecca Mott
Defendant: Guaranteed Rate, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv05322
Filed: September 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Harry D Leinenweber
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2021 Filing 30 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: 1) MOTION by Attorneys Hille R. Sheppard, Charles K. Schafer, Daniel C. Craig and Jason G. Marsico ("Sidley") to withdraw as attorney for Guaranteed Rate, Inc is granted #28 . Mailed notice (maf)
October 1, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE by Guaranteed Rate, Inc. re MOTION by Attorney Hille R. Sheppard, Charles K. Schafer, Daniel C. Craig and Jason G. Marsico ("Sidley") to withdraw as attorney for Guaranteed Rate, Inc.. No party information provided #28 (Craig, Daniel)
October 1, 2021 Filing 28 MOTION by Attorney Hille R. Sheppard, Charles K. Schafer, Daniel C. Craig and Jason G. Marsico ("Sidley") to withdraw as attorney for Guaranteed Rate, Inc.. No party information provided (Craig, Daniel)
September 29, 2021 Filing 27 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Guaranteed Rate, Inc. by Yesha Sutaria Hoeppner (Hoeppner, Yesha)
September 29, 2021 Filing 26 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Guaranteed Rate, Inc. by Randall D. Lehner (Lehner, Randall)
August 26, 2021 Filing 25 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Pursuant to the Parties' joint status report #24 the Court strikes the status conference set for 9/9/21. The Parties shall file a joint status report within 7 days of the conclusion of the arbitration hearing advising the Court on the outcome and proposing next steps. Mailed notice(maf)
August 26, 2021 Filing 24 STATUS Report by Rebecca Mott (Haling, Allie)
August 26, 2021 Filing 23 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Rebecca Mott by Harry Oliver Channon (Channon, Harry)
July 27, 2021 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Telephone Conference set for 9/9/2021 at 9:15 a.m. Joint status report shall be filed by 8/26/2021. Dial: 8886848852 or 2154460155, access code: 9582710#. Security code (if asked):8115. Mailed notice(maf)
February 23, 2021 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Motion to withdraw and substitute attorney #19 is granted. Mailed notice(maf)
February 23, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE by Rebecca Mott re MOTION by Attorney Jeffrey L. Widman, Martin R. Martos II, Jennifer Devroye and Laura E. Caplin of the law firm Fox Rothschild LLP to withdraw as attorney for Rebecca Mott. No party information provided #19 (Widman, Jeffrey)
February 23, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION by Attorney Jeffrey L. Widman, Martin R. Martos II, Jennifer Devroye and Laura E. Caplin of the law firm Fox Rothschild LLP to withdraw as attorney for Rebecca Mott. No party information provided (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Widman, Jeffrey)
December 2, 2020 Filing 18 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Rebecca Mott by Jennifer Lynn Wyatt Devroye (Devroye, Jennifer)
December 2, 2020 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Rebecca Mott by Martin R. Martos, II (Martos, Martin)
November 20, 2020 Filing 16 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 11/18/20 before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Order Number: 39621. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colleen Conway, OCR - colleen_conway@ilnd.uscourts.gov or 312.435.5594. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 12/11/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/21/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/18/2021. (Conway, Colleen)
November 18, 2020 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Telephonic motion hearing held. The Court grants Defendant Mott's motion to enforce arbitration agreement #8 and orders the case to be stayed pending arbitration. Mailed notice (maf)
November 16, 2020 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Telephone Conference set for 11/18/20 at 9:30 a.m. is re-set to 11/18/20 at 9:45 a.m. re: MOTION by Defendant Guaranteed Rate, Inc. to enforce arbitration agreement #8. Mailed notice(maf)
November 10, 2020 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Telephone Conference set for 11/18/20 at 9:30 a.m. re: MOTION by Defendant Guaranteed Rate, Inc. to enforce arbitration agreement #8 . Dial in information will be provided. Mailed notice(maf)
November 9, 2020 Filing 12 EXHIBIT by Defendant Guaranteed Rate, Inc. (Exhibit 1) regarding MOTION by Defendant Guaranteed Rate, Inc. to enforce arbitration agreementMOTION by Defendant Guaranteed Rate, Inc. to stay litigation #8 (Marsico, Jason)
November 9, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Guaranteed Rate, Inc. by Daniel Cochran Craig (Craig, Daniel)
November 9, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Guaranteed Rate, Inc. by Charles Kenneth Schafer (Schafer, Charles)
November 9, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Guaranteed Rate, Inc. by Hille von Rosenvinge Sheppard (Sheppard, Hille)
November 9, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION by Defendant Guaranteed Rate, Inc. to enforce arbitration agreement, MOTION by Defendant Guaranteed Rate, Inc. to stay litigation (Marsico, Jason)
November 9, 2020 Filing 7 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Guaranteed Rate, Inc. (Marsico, Jason)
November 9, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Guaranteed Rate, Inc. by Jason Gregory Marsico (Marsico, Jason)
September 24, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Rebecca Mott. Guaranteed Rate, Inc. waiver sent on 9/10/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. (Widman, Jeffrey)
September 10, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Rebecca Mott by Laura Elizabeth Caplin (Caplin, Laura)
September 10, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (mp, )
September 9, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Rebecca Mott by Jeffrey L. Widman (Widman, Jeffrey)
September 9, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Widman, Jeffrey)
September 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Rebecca Mott; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17412703.(Widman, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mott v. Guaranteed Rate, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Mott
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Widman
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Caplin
Represented By: Martin R. Martos, II
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Wyatt Devroye
Represented By: Harry Oliver Channon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guaranteed Rate, Inc.
Represented By: Hille von Rosenvinge Sheppard
Represented By: Daniel Cochran Craig
Represented By: Jason Gregory Marsico
Represented By: Charles Kenneth Schafer
Represented By: Randall D. Lehner
Represented By: Yesha Sutaria Hoeppner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?