Yost v. Carroll
Plaintiff: R. David Yost
Defendant: Morgan Timothy Carroll
Case Number: 1:2020cv05393
Filed: September 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Joan H Lefkow
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by R. David Yost. Morgan Timothy Carroll waiver sent on 9/11/2020, answer due 11/10/2020. (Lefler, Debra)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow: Initial status hearing is set for 12/1/2020 at 11:00 a.m. Mailed notice (ags)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff R. David Yost by Debra Kathryn Lefler (Lefler, Debra)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff R. David Yost by Bonita L. Stone (Stone, Bonita)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Stone, Bonita)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by R. David Yost; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17425184. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Stone, Bonita)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yost v. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. David Yost
Represented By: Debra Kathryn Lefler
Represented By: Bonita L. Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Timothy Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?