Vasquez v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Estela A Vasquez
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2020cv05516
Filed: September 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Susan E Cox
Referring Judge: Martha M Pacold
Nature of Suit: Social Security: Black Lung
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2020 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Susan E. Cox: This case has been reassigned to Judge Cox. Defendant shall answer or otherwise plead to Plaintiff's complaint by 12/22/2020 and deliver a courtesy copy to Room 1024. Pursuant to Local Rule 8.1(b), the Social Security Administration's filing of the certified administrative record, in and of itself, shall suffice as the agency's answer to the complaint. Plaintiff's opening brief is due on or before 2/22/2021. Defendant's response brief is due on or before 4/8/2021. Plaintiff's reply, if any, is due on or before 4/22/2021. Mailed notice (np, )
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING Case to the Honorable Susan E. Cox, pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(C) for all further proceedings, parties having consented to the reassignment. Honorable Martha M. Pacold no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 10/23/2020. (lma, )
October 23, 2020 Filing 12 JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Schultz, Barry)
October 23, 2020 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: By 12/11/2020, the parties are directed to file an initial joint status report indicating whether they agree to a remand and whether they consent to reassignment for all purposes to the Magistrate Judge. With respect to scheduling, the parties shall comply with Local Rule 16.4. (rao, )
October 12, 2020 Filing 10 JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (Schultz, Barry)
October 9, 2020 Filing 9 DESIGNATION of Scott Dennis Heffron as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Social Security Administration (Heffron, Scott)
September 25, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Estela A Vasquez by Barry Alan Schultz (Schultz, Barry)
September 21, 2020 Filing 7 COMPLAINT filed by Estela A Vasquez (sxb, )
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Plaintiff's application to proceed without prepaying fees or costs #4 and motion for attorney representation #5 are granted. The Court recruits Barry A. Schultz of the Law Offices of Barry A. Schultz, 1601 Sherman Avenue, Suite 500, Evanston, IL 60201, (847) 864-0224, maisha@barryschultz.com, to represent plaintiff. The parties are directed to file an initial joint status report by 11/20/2020, indicating whether they agree to a remand and whether they consent to reassignment for all purposes to the Magistrate Judge. With respect to scheduling the parties shall comply with Local Rule 16.4. Signed by the Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 9/21/2020. Mailed notice. (sxb, )
September 17, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiff Estela A Vasquez for attorney representation (sxb, )
September 17, 2020 Filing 4 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Estela A Vasquez for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (sxb, )
September 17, 2020 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Estela A Vasquez (sxb, )
September 17, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (sxb, )
September 17, 2020 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by Estela A Vasquez (sxb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vasquez v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estela A Vasquez
Represented By: Barry Alan Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: AUSA-SSA
Represented By: Scott Dennis Heffron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?