Thomas v. Guaranteed Rate, Inc.
Plaintiff: Greg Thomas
Defendant: Guaranteed Rate, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv05531
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Robert Blakey
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2021 Filing 21 ENTERED JUDGMENT Mailed notice(gel, )
March 16, 2021 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Based upon the filing of the stipulation of dismissal #19 , this case is dismissed with prejudice. All pending motions are denied as moot. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (gel, )
March 10, 2021 Filing 19 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Caplin, Laura)
December 16, 2020 Filing 18 REPLY by Guaranteed Rate, Inc. to response in opposition to motion, #17 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Marsico, Jason)
December 9, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE by Greg Thomasin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Guaranteed Rate, Inc. to enforce Arbitration Agreement AndMOTION by Defendant Guaranteed Rate, Inc. to stay Litigation #13 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Martos, Martin)
December 2, 2020 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Greg Thomas by Jennifer Lynn Wyatt Devroye (Devroye, Jennifer)
December 2, 2020 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Greg Thomas by Martin R. Martos, II (Martos, Martin)
November 19, 2020 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant's motion to enforce arbitration agreement and stay litigation #13 by 12/9/20, and Defendant shall file any reply by 12/16/20. The Court will rule on the motion in due course and set additional case management dates as needed in a future order. Mailed notice (gel, )
November 17, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION by Defendant Guaranteed Rate, Inc. to enforce Arbitration Agreement And, MOTION by Defendant Guaranteed Rate, Inc. to stay Litigation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Marsico, Jason)
November 17, 2020 Filing 12 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Guaranteed Rate, Inc. (Marsico, Jason)
November 17, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Guaranteed Rate, Inc. by Jason Gregory Marsico (Marsico, Jason)
November 17, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Guaranteed Rate, Inc. by Daniel Cochran Craig (Craig, Daniel)
November 17, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Guaranteed Rate, Inc. by Charles Kenneth Schafer (Schafer, Charles)
November 17, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Guaranteed Rate, Inc. by Hille von Rosenvinge Sheppard (Sheppard, Hille)
November 5, 2020 Filing 7 STATUS Report by Greg Thomas (Caplin, Laura)
September 24, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Greg Thomas. Guaranteed Rate, Inc. waiver sent on 9/18/2020, answer due 11/17/2020. (Widman, Jeffrey)
September 23, 2020 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. The litigants are ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Court's standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Court's official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. In addition, the parties must file a status report no later than 11/5/2020, using the model template set forth in this Court's standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. Failure by any party to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary, individually with an explanation as to why a joint report could not be filed) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute, or an entry of default against any served defendant(s) failing to comply with this order. During the litigation, the attorneys must also appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at (312)818-6699. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. Mailed notice (gel, )
September 18, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Greg Thomas by Laura Elizabeth Caplin (Caplin, Laura)
September 18, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Greg Thomas by Jeffrey L. Widman (Widman, Jeffrey)
September 18, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Widman, Jeffrey)
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Greg Thomas; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17450691.(Widman, Jeffrey)
September 18, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (gw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Guaranteed Rate, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guaranteed Rate, Inc.
Represented By: Hille von Rosenvinge Sheppard
Represented By: Daniel Cochran Craig
Represented By: Jason Gregory Marsico
Represented By: Charles Kenneth Schafer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Thomas
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Widman
Represented By: Laura Elizabeth Caplin
Represented By: Martin R. Martos, II
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Wyatt Devroye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?