Emoji Company GmbH v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto
Plaintiff: Emoji Company GmbH
Defendant: The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto and onlove
Case Number: 1:2020cv05699
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Emoji Company GmbH Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Hierl, Michael)
November 10, 2020 Filing 36 INJUNCTION BOND BOND in the amount of $10,000.00 posted by Emoji Company GmbH. (Document not scanned). (ec, ) Modified on 11/10/2020 (ec, ).
November 9, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Emoji Company GmbH Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Hierl, Michael)
October 27, 2020 Filing 34 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Preliminary injunction hearing date of 10/27/2020 is vacated. (mk)
October 27, 2020 Filing 33 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 10/27/2020: Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction #30 is granted. The hearing date of 10/27/2020 is vacated. The case is set for a telephone status hearing on 1/5/2021 at 8:50 AM, using call-in number 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. Counsel should wait for the case to be called before announcing themselves. Plaintiff is directed to file a status report on 12/23/2020 regarding service of the injunction, settlement, and any other issues that it wishes to bring to the Court's attention. (mk)
October 19, 2020 Filing 32 DECLARATION of Michael A. Hierl regarding motion for preliminary injunction #30 (Hierl, Michael)
October 19, 2020 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM by Emoji Company GmbH in support of motion for preliminary injunction #30 (Hierl, Michael)
October 19, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION by Plaintiff Emoji Company GmbH for preliminary injunction Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of a Preliminary Injunction (Hierl, Michael)
October 8, 2020 Filing 29 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Plaintiff's ex parte motion to extend temporary restraining order #28 is granted. The temporary restraining order entered by the Court on 9/28/2020 is extended through 10/27/2020. Preliminary injunction hearing is reset to 10/27/2020 at 9:20 AM, using call-in number 888-684-8852 / access code 746-1053. Counsel should wait for the case to be called before announcing themselves. Deadline for filing motion for preliminary injunction is 10/22/2020. (mk)
October 8, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION by Plaintiff Emoji Company GmbH for extension of time Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion to Extend the Temporary Restraining Order (Hierl, Michael)
September 28, 2020 Filing 27 MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials(ec, )
September 28, 2020 Filing 26 MAILED report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (ec, ) Modified on 9/28/2020 (ec, ).
September 28, 2020 Filing 25 SEALED TEMPORARY Restraining Order: Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/28/2020. Mailed notice. (mma, )
September 28, 2020 Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Plaintiffs' motions for leave to file under seal #5 and for leave to exceed page limitation #7 are granted. Plaintiff's ex parte motion for entry of a temporary restraining order and service of process by e-mail, etc. (8) is also granted. Enter sealed Temporary Restraining Order. Preliminary injunction hearing is set for 10/13/2020 at 8:55 AM using call-in number 888-684-8852 / access code 746-1053. Counsel should wait for the case to be called before announcing themselves. Motion for preliminary injunction is to be filed by 10/8/2020. Mailed notice. (mma, )
September 25, 2020 Filing 23 Notice of Claims Involving Trademarks by Emoji Company GmbH (Hierl, Michael)
September 25, 2020 Filing 22 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Emoji Company GmbH Exhibit 2 Part 13 of Reiter Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
September 25, 2020 Filing 21 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Emoji Company GmbH Exhibit 2 Part 12 of Reiter Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
September 25, 2020 Filing 20 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Emoji Company GmbH Exhibit 2 Part 11 of Reiter Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
September 25, 2020 Filing 19 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Emoji Company GmbH Exhibit 2 Part 10 of Reiter Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
September 25, 2020 Filing 18 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Emoji Company GmbH Exhibit 2 Part 9 of Reiter Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
September 25, 2020 Filing 17 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Emoji Company GmbH Exhibit 2 Part 8 of Reiter Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
September 25, 2020 Filing 16 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Emoji Company GmbH Exhibit 2 Part 7 of Reiter Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
September 25, 2020 Filing 15 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Emoji Company GmbH Exhibit 2 Part 6 of Reiter Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
September 25, 2020 Filing 14 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Emoji Company GmbH Exhibit 2 Part 5 of Reiter Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
September 25, 2020 Filing 13 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Emoji Company GmbH Exhibit 2 Part 4 of Reiter Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
September 25, 2020 Filing 12 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Emoji Company GmbH Exhibit 2 Part 3 of Reiter Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
September 25, 2020 Filing 11 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Emoji Company GmbH Exhibit 2 Part 2 of Reiter Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
September 25, 2020 Filing 10 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Emoji Company GmbH Exhibit 2 Part 1 of Reiter Declaration (Hierl, Michael)
September 25, 2020 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM by Emoji Company GmbH in support of motion for temporary restraining order, #8 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Santiago Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Declaration Reiter Declaration, #4 Declaration Hierl Declaration, #5 Exhibit Hierl Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit Hierl Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit Hierl Exhibit 3)(Hierl, Michael)
September 25, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION by Plaintiff Emoji Company GmbH for temporary restraining order Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Entry of a Temporary Restraining Order, Including a Temporary Injunction, a Temporary Transfer of the Defendant Domain Names, a Temporary Asset Restraint, Expedited Discovery, and Service of Process by Email and/or Electronic Publication (Hierl, Michael)
September 25, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiff Emoji Company GmbH for leave to file excess pages Plaintiff's Motion to Exceed Page Limitation (Hierl, Michael)
September 25, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kl, )
September 25, 2020 Filing 6 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Emoji Company GmbH Sealed Schedule A (Hierl, Michael)
September 25, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiff Emoji Company GmbH to seal document Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (Hierl, Michael)
September 25, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Emoji Company GmbH by William Benjamin Kalbac (Kalbac, William)
September 25, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Emoji Company GmbH by Michael A. Hierl (Hierl, Michael)
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Hierl, Michael)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Emoji Company GmbH; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17473982. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Hierl, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emoji Company GmbH v. The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emoji Company GmbH
Represented By: Michael A. Hierl
Represented By: William Benjamin Kalbac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Individuals, Corporations, Limited Liability Companies, Partnerships, and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A Hereto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: onlove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?