Stanley v. Santander Consumer USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: David U Stanley
Defendant: Landon J Wade, Santander Consumer USA, Inc., Heather Beltran, James C Cooper, Michael K Ferguson, Santander Auto Finance, City of Chicago, a municipal corporation, Santander Consumer USA, Inc. an Illinois Corporation doing business as Santander Auto Finance, L.J Wade, City Of Chicago, J.C Cooper and M.K Ferguson
Respondent: M & F Imports, Inc and Lucky Motors, Inc
Case Number: 1:2020cv05823
Filed: September 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Andrea R Wood
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Defendant City of Chicago's second unopposed motion for extension of time #21 is granted. Defendant City of Chicago shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by 12/18/2020. At Defendant's unopposed request, the telephonic status hearing set for 11/18/2020 is stricken and reset for 12/23/2020 at 9:00 AM. To ensure public access to court proceedings, members of the public and media may call in to listen to telephonic hearings. The call-in number is (888) 557-8511 and the access code is 3547847. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (dal, )
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE by Bret Anthony Kabacinski of Change of Address (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (List of Cases Con'd))(Kabacinski, Bret)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE by Danielle Marie Alvarez of Change of Address (Alvarez, Danielle)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE by Raoul Vertick Mowatt of Change of Address (Mowatt, Raoul)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION by Defendant City Of Chicago for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead (Alvarez, Danielle)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City Of Chicago by Danielle Marie Alvarez (Alvarez, Danielle)
November 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STATUS Report Joint Initial Status Report by Plaintiff and by Heather Beltran, City Of Chicago, Santander Consumer USA, Inc. (Brunner, Robert)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: At the emailed request of the parties, the Court enters the following briefing schedule on Defendants Santander Consumer USA, Inc. and Heather Beltran's Motion to Dismiss #16 : Plaintiff shall reply by 12/17/2020 and Defendants Santander and Beltran shall reply by 1/7/2021. Mailed notice (dal, )
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Heather Beltran, Santander Consumer USA, Inc. (Memorandum in Support) (Brunner, Robert)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Heather Beltran, Santander Consumer USA, Inc. (Brunner, Robert)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Defendants' unopposed motions for extension of time to respond to Plaintiff's complaint #9 , #10 and Defendant City of Chicago's unopposed motion for extension of time #13 are granted. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by 11/13/2020. Telephonic initial status hearing set for 11/6/2020 is stricken and reset for 11/18/2020 at 10:15 AM. To ensure public access to court proceedings, members of the public and media may call in to listen to telephonic hearings. The call-in number is (888) 557-8511 and the access code is 3547847. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. Mailed notice (dal, )
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff David U Stanley by Thomas L Murphy (Murphy, Thomas)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION by Defendant City Of Chicago for extension of time to file answer (unopposed) (Mowatt, Raoul)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City Of Chicago by Raoul Vertick Mowatt (Mowatt, Raoul)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Heather Beltran by Robert Brunner (Brunner, Robert)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION by Defendants Heather Beltran, Santander Consumer USA, Inc. for extension of time to respond to complaint (Amended) (UNOPPOSED) (Brunner, Robert)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION by Defendant Santander Consumer USA, Inc. for extension of time to file response to complaint (UNOPPOSED) (Brunner, Robert)
October 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Santander Consumer USA, Inc. by Robert Brunner (Brunner, Robert)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Telephonic initial status hearing set for 11/6/2020 at 9:45 AM. To ensure public access to court proceedings, members of the public and media may call in to listen to telephonic hearings. The call-in number is (888) 557-8511 and the access code is 3547847. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. Mailed notice (dal, )
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff David U Stanley by Algis Frank Baliunas (Baliunas, Algis)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (mc, )
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Kabacinski, Bret)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Chicago, a municipal corporation by Bret Anthony Kabacinski (Kabacinski, Bret)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Cook County Circuit Court of Illinois, case number (2020L009053) filed by City of Chicago, a municipal corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Summons & Complaint))(Kabacinski, Bret)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. FEE DUE, NO INFORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION SUBMITTED. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stanley v. Santander Consumer USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landon J Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santander Consumer USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Beltran
Represented By: Robert Brunner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James C Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael K Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santander Auto Finance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Chicago, a municipal corporation
Represented By: Bret Anthony Kabacinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santander Consumer USA, Inc. an Illinois Corporation doing business as Santander Auto Finance
Represented By: Robert Brunner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.J Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Chicago
Represented By: Bret Anthony Kabacinski
Represented By: Raoul Vertick Mowatt
Represented By: Danielle Marie Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.C Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.K Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David U Stanley
Represented By: Algis Frank Baliunas
Represented By: Thomas L Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: M & F Imports, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lucky Motors, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?